Crouch et al v. Teledyne Continental Motors, Inc.

Plaintiff: Larry Crouch, Rhonda Mae Crouch, Teddy Lee Hudson and Carolyn Sue Hudson
Defendant: Teledyne Continental Motors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00072
Filed: February 17, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Airline Crash
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered denying 12 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/20/2010. (mca)
April 21, 2011 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying in part and carrying to trial the issue of sufficiency of the evidence re: 67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 87 Motion for Oral Argument; denying 97 Motion for Leave to File a surreply; finding as moot 111 Motion to Strike the surreply. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/21/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
June 16, 2011 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 205 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/16/2011. (cmj)
June 22, 2011 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 135 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/22/2011. (sdb)
June 24, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered that upon consideration, and for the reasons, set forth herein, plaintiffs motion for leave to amend the complaint 20 is GRANTED and plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint on or before July 6, 2010. Defendants motion for leave to file sur-reply 26 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/24/2010. (mca)
June 29, 2011 314 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 214 Motion to Strike ; granting 232 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 233 Motion ; granting 234 Motion ; striking 235 Motion ; striking 236 Motion ; striking 238 Motion ; striking 239 Motion ; granting in part and denying in part 241 Motion ; granting 242 Motion all as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/29/2011. (cmj)
June 29, 2011 315 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 240 Motion as set out.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/29/2011. (cmj)
July 5, 2011 320 Opinion or Order of the Court Order entered that this matter is before the court on the issue of the elements of each remaining claim. The parties were unable to agree on the elements of the claims or even the remaining claims. Upon consideration, the court finds the following claims and elements are at issue as fully set out in this Order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/5/2011. (mca)
July 6, 2011 328 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 229 Motion in Limine as set out. This order addresses only the "other incidents" for purposes of determining substantial similarity. The remaining objections to specified evidence are carried to trial. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/6/2011. Copies to parties. (mpp)
July 8, 2011 343 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 335 Motion for Reconsideration. The matter will be reconsidered upon recess of the trial on Monday, July 11, 2011. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/8/2011. (sdb)
July 8, 2011 344 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 337 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/8/2011. (sdb)
July 13, 2011 354 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 352 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/13/2011. (cmj)
July 15, 2011 361 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 356 Motion Pursuant to Rule 401/403; granting 358 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/15/2011. (sdb)
August 9, 2011 383 Opinion or Order of the Court Order on Jury Trial as set out. By separate document, the Court will enter judgment in accordance with the verdict of the jury. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/9/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Verdict) (mca)
August 9, 2011 384 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered that in accordance with the verdict, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that JUDGMENT is entered in favor of the defendant Teledyne Continental Motors, Inc. and against the plaintiffs Larry Dale Crouch, Rhonda Mae Crouch, Teddy Lee Hudson and Carolyn Sue Hudson. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/9/2011. (mca)
January 17, 2013 445 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 390 Bill of Costs filed by Teledyne Continental Motors, Inc., and 392 Corrected Bill of Costs, filed by Teledyne Continental Motors, Inc. For reasons set forth in the order, costs are taxed in the total amount of $35,499.48. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/17/2013. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crouch et al v. Teledyne Continental Motors, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Crouch
Represented By: Simone R. Siex
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Mae Crouch
Represented By: Simone R. Siex
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teddy Lee Hudson
Represented By: E. Frederick Straub, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Sue Hudson
Represented By: E. Frederick Straub, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teledyne Continental Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Starr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]