Nielson et al v. Eagle Tugs, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Derrin Nielson, Samuel Griswold, Chad Duet and Steven Scoggins
Defendant: Eagle Tugs, LLC, M/V Mr. Lester and Chaisson Tugs, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00074
Filed: February 18, 2010
 
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0688 Marine-Jones Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2011 61 Featured Case Order, DEFAULT is entered against Dfts Eagle Tugs, LLC, Chaisson Tugs, LLC, in personam, the M/V MR. LESTER, & the M/V CARL T., in rem., for failure to comply w/this court's order & defend this action as set out. Plfs & Intervenor Plf Wells are to file motions for default judgment on or before 10/19/2011 as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/5/2011. (tot)
February 2, 2012 73 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Samuel Griswold against Chaisson Tugs, LLC, Eagle Tugs, LLC in the total sum of $8,200.00 plus pre-judgment interest thereon from 12/24/09 until the date of entry of this judgment on the docket, at the rate of 6% ; per annum. Post-judgment interest shall accrue at the rate of .12% from the date this judgment is entered on the docket until the judgment is paid. Costs are to be taxed against the dfts. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/2/12. (copies mailed to Chaisson Tugs, LLC & Eagle Tugs, LLC on 2/3/12) (tot) Modified on 2/3/2012 (tot).
February 2, 2012 74 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Chad Duet against Chaisson Tugs, LLC, Eagle Tugs, LLC in the total sum of $7,200.00 plus pre-judgment interest thereon from 1/9/10 until the date of entry of this judgment on the docket, at the rate of 6% per an num. Post-judgment interest shall accrue at the rate of .12% from the date this judgment is entered on the docket until the judgment is paid. Costs are to be taxed against the dfts. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/2/12. (copies mailed to Chaisson Tugs, LLC & Eagle Tugs, LLC on 2/3/12) (tot) Modified on 2/3/2012 (tot).
February 2, 2012 75 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Steven Scoggins against Chaisson Tugs, LLC, Eagle Tugs, LLC in the total sum of $3,141.00 plus pre-judgment interest thereon from 8/31/08 until the date of entry of this judgment on the docket, at the rate of 6% ; per annum. Post-judgment interest shall accrue at the rate of .12% from the date this judgment is entered on the docket until the judgment is paid. Costs are to be taxed against the dfts. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/2/12. (copies mailed to Chaisson Tugs, LLC & Eagle Tugs, LLC on 2/3/12) (tot) Modified on 2/3/2012 (tot).
February 2, 2012 76 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Christopher J. Wells against Chaisson Tugs, LLC, Eagle Tugs, LLC in the total sum of $4,000.00 plus pre-judgment interest thereon from 1/9/10 until the date of entry of this judgment on the docket, at the rate of 6& #037; per annum. Post-judgment interest shall accrue at the rate of .12% from the date this judgment is entered on the docket until the judgment is paid. Costs are to be taxed against the dfts. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/2/12. (copies mailed to Chaisson Tugs, LLC & Eagle Tugs, LLC on 2/3/12) (tot) Modified on 2/3/2012 (tot).
February 23, 2012 79 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING Plf Derrin Nielson's claims against Dfts W/O PREJUDICE for failure to comply w/the court's orders & to prosecute this action. Default having been entered against Dfts in favor of Plfs Griswold, Duet, Scoggins & Wells, & there being no further matters pending, the clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/23/12. (tot) Modified on 2/23/2012 (tot).
March 15, 2012 82 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT, Plf Nielson's 80 MOTION to Set Aside Order is GRANTED as set out. 79 Order dismissing Plf Nielson's claims for failure to prosecute is SET ASIDE & VACATED. Judgment is entered in favor of Derrin Nielson against Chaiss on Tugs, LLC, Eagle Tugs, LLC. in the total sum of $9,962.50, plus pre-judgment interest at the rate of 6% per annum from 12/15/09 through the date of this judgment, & post-judgment interest shall accrue at the rate of.18% from the date this judgment is entered on the docket until the judgment is paid. Costs are to be taxed against Dfts. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/15/2012. (copies mailed to Chaisson Tugs, LLC & Eagle Tugs, LLC on 3/16/12) (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nielson et al v. Eagle Tugs, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrin Nielson
Represented By: Ross Diamond, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Griswold
Represented By: Ross Diamond, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Duet
Represented By: Ross Diamond, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Scoggins
Represented By: Ross Diamond, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Tugs, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Mr. Lester
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaisson Tugs, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]