Cooper v. Escambia County Commission et al

Plaintiff: JoAnn P. Cooper
Defendant: Escambia County Commission, Suzanne Sirmon and Johnnie Sirmon
Case Number: 1:2010cv00330
Filed: June 25, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Escambia
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2012 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing with prejudice the plaintiff's claim for abuse of process. The 112 Motion in Limine is denied as moot. The 113 Motion in Limine is granted. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/26/12. (tgw)
August 5, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Motion for Reconsideration of District Judge Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/5/2011. (sdb)
August 15, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 50 Motion to Limit Discovery (to Terminate Deposition of JoAnn Cooper). The Court DECLINES to specifically and officially sanction the resumption of JoAnn Cooper's deposition after the close of discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 8/12/2011. copies to parties (sdb)
November 28, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion for Summary Judgment The Commissions motion for summary judgment is GRANTED on thefollowing issue: Cooper is not entitled t o a declaration that ChristmasTree Lane is a public road. The Commissions motion for summary judgment on Coopers § 1983 claimagainst it (Count Three of the Amended Counterclaims) is GRANTED. The Sirmons motion for summary judgment is GRANTED wit h respect toCoopers adverse possession claim. The Sirmons motion for summary judgment is DENIED with respect toCoopers claims for declaration of an easement by prescription and/or aneasement by necessity.. Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr on 11/29/2011. (adk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Escambia County Commission et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnn P. Cooper
Represented By: Gary Shane Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escambia County Commission
Represented By: Todd Stearns
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Sirmon
Represented By: Todd Stearns
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnnie Sirmon
Represented By: Todd Stearns
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]