Precision IBC, Inc. v. PCM Capital, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Precision IBC, Inc.
Defendant: PCM Capital, LLC, Tote Liquid Systems Division, Van P. Finger, V. Palmer Finger, III and HCB Publishing Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00682
Filed: December 10, 2010
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Baldwin
Presiding Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2011 180 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 145 Objection & Motion to Amend 130 Order. Mag. Judge's 130 Order is REVERSED in part & AMENDED to the extent that Plf's 98 Motion for Protective Order & and to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas is DENIED as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/12/2011. (tot)
August 4, 2011 194 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER of Permanent Injunction & JUDGMENT Related to Tote Systems International, LP as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/4/2011. (tot)
November 10, 2011 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 206 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is ORDERED that Defendants' 153 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint be DENIED with respect to Plaintiff's false advertising claim under the Lanham Act and Plaintiff's conspiracy claim, and GRANTED with respect to Plaintiff's defamation claim. Plaintiff's 176 Motion to Strike is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/10/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)
March 5, 2012 268 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 236 Statement of Appeal of Mag. Judge's Order, 241 Statement of Appeal of Mag. Judge's Order, & 244 Appeal of Magistrate Judge's Order. Court finds that the Magistrate Judge's 221 Order, 232 Order are AFFIRMED as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/5/2012. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precision IBC, Inc. v. PCM Capital, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision IBC, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Laurie McClurkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCM Capital, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tote Liquid Systems Division
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van P. Finger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Palmer Finger, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCB Publishing Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]