Synovus Bank v. Vessel ACCU V

Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Defendant: Vessel ACCU V
Claimant: Accumarine Transportation, LP
Intervenor: Henry A. Petter Supply Company, LLC dba Henry A. Petter Supply Company
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00116
Filed: March 4, 2011
 
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
 
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2012 107 Featured Case Order granting 74 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Synovus Bank. The final pretrial conference is indefinitely continued. The MagistrateJudge will direct the parties as to filing a supplemental Rule 26(f) report, following which she will enter an amended Rule 16(b) scheduling order that will establish new dates for the final pretrial conference and trial. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/19/2012. (tgw)
September 25, 2012 135 Featured Case ORDER granting 127 Motion for Default Judgment against Aspen Orleans, L.P.; granting in part and denying in part 128 Motion for Attorney Fees. The plaintiff is entitled to judgment against Aspen in the amount of $3,020,169.95. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/25/2012. (tgw)
October 4, 2012 140 Featured Case Order: The 130 Application to Clerk for Entry of Default against defendant Accumarine Transportation, L.P., construed as a motion for entry of default judgment is granted. The plaintiff is entitled to judgment against Accumarine in the amount of $3,034,088.88. Judgment shall be entered accordingly by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/4/2012. (tgw)
February 22, 2012 95 Featured Case ORDER denying 85 Rule 56(d) Motion. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/22/12. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Vessel ACCU V
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: Abram Lewis Philips, Jr.
Represented By: John P. Kavanagh, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vessel ACCU V
Represented By: William Craig Hamilton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Accumarine Transportation, LP
Represented By: William Craig Hamilton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Henry A. Petter Supply Company, LLC dba Henry A. Petter Supply Company
Represented By: Bobby R. Miller, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]