JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Surek et al

Defendant: Christopher L. Surek and Katherine B. Surek
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00263
Filed: May 20, 2011
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Order enterd re: 19 Suggestion of Bankruptcy filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. It is hereby ORDERED that all proceedings against Defendant Christopher L. Surek are STAYED pending further Order of this Court. This matter remains pending as to Defendant Katherine B. Surek. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/20/2011. copy mailed to defendants (mca)
November 4, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Katherine B. Surek in the amount of $314,912.83 ($295,584.19 for principal, $19,253.64 in accrued interest plus $75.00 in late charges/fees). Plaintiff also alleg es it is entitled to attorneys fees and costs. However, in its motion for default judgment, Plaintiff has not provided any support for such request. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file, on or before November 18, 2011, materials it deems necessary to suppor t its claim for costs and fees. The Court will take the matter under submission and a separate Judgment and Decree of Foreclosure, as to Defendant Katherine B. Surek, shall issue in conjunction with this Order after resolution of the request for attorneys fees and costs.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/3/2011. (cmj)
February 3, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court Order DENYING 22 request for attorneys' fees and costs filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/3/12. (cmj)
February 8, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE in favor of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. against Katherine B. Surek. (To be advertised 2/15, 2/22, 2/29, 3/7 and the sale 3/15/12). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/7/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Sale) (copies to USM) (cmj)
June 14, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 29 MOTION to Confirm Sale filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. The foreclosure sale of property be held in abeyance as set out; denying request for publication costs as set out; the request for post judgment and other interest is denied; the proposed deed is approved, as set out. Plaintiff is ordered to file a response concerning amount due to defendant Surek.( Miscellaneous deadline set for 6/21/2012.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/14/2012. (cmj)
January 2, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered on Plaintiff JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.s Response (Doc. 32) to the Courts Order (Doc. 30) regarding its previously filed Motion to Confirm Foreclosure Sale (Doc. 29). The Court construes the Response as a motion to reconsider the prior ruling (Doc. 30) as fully set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/2/2013. copy to USM (hand-delivered) (mca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Surek et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher L. Surek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine B. Surek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Sandy G. Robinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]