Mykins v. Alabama Department of Human Resources (DHR) et al

Plaintiff: Rosa Mykins
Defendant: Alabama Department of Human Resources (DHR), Thomas James Craig, Jena Jo Michael Craig, Sheila V. Stone and Baldwin County Department of Human Resources
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00264
Filed: May 20, 2011
 
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part denying in part 17 MOTION to Dismiss. Surviving the motion to dismiss are the Title VI claim (Count 7) as against the DHR defendants and the conspiracy claims (Counts 10-12) as against the Craigs. Plaintiff is ordered by 10/14/2011 to file an amended complaint as set out. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 9/29/2011. (tgw)
October 23, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 45 MOTION for leave to Seal Document filed by the defendants. The defendants are ordered to file a supplemental brief by 11/6/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/23/2012. Copy mailed to Rosa Mykins. (tgw)
December 12, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. This action, and every claim asserted therein against these defendants, is dismissed with prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/12/2012. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)
December 12, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part denying in part 45 MOTION for leave to Seal Document filed by defendants. Defendants are ordered by 12/19/2012 to refile Exhibits 17-26 redacting only the minors' names to initials. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/12/2012. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mykins v. Alabama Department of Human Resources (DHR) et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Mykins
Represented By: Ishmael Jaffree
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Department of Human Resources (DHR)
Represented By: James E. Long
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas James Craig
Represented By: James E. Long
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jena Jo Michael Craig
Represented By: James E. Long
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheila V. Stone
Represented By: Sheila Virginia Stone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baldwin County Department of Human Resources
Represented By: Laurie Angerdina Hoyt
Represented By: James E. Long
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]