United States of America v. 0.13 Acres of Land, more or less, Located in Evergreen, Conecuh County, State of Alabama et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 0.13 Acres of Land, more or less, Located in Evergreen, Conecuh County, State of Alabama, The Country Store, Charles M. Ward, Jr., Conecuh County Revenue Commissioner and U.S. Small Business Administrator
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00238
Filed: April 5, 2012
 
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Conecuh
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
 
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 40:258
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting re: 20 Status Report/Joint Motion to Stay filed by United States of America. This action is stayed until 7/9/13. Status Report due by 4/11/2013. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/11/2013. (cmj)
September 5, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for Revestment as further set out in order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/5/2013. (srr)
May 1, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/30/2014. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. 0.13 Acres of Land, more or less, Located in Evergreen, Conecuh County, State of Alabama et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Beyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.13 Acres of Land, more or less, Located in Evergreen, Conecuh County, State of Alabama
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Country Store
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles M. Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel L. Stockman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conecuh County Revenue Commissioner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Small Business Administrator
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]