Natures Way Marine, LLC v. EverClear of Ohio, Ltd. et al

Defendant: EverClear of Ohio, Ltd. and Nirk Magnate Holding Corp.
Plaintiff: Natures Way Marine, LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv00316
Filed: May 15, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2014 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Dfts' 108 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/12/2014. (tot)
August 26, 2014 157 Opinion or Order of the Court Order CONTINUING trial of this action to the November 2014 trial term commencing w/jury selection on 11/4/2014. Trial will begin on 11/17/2014 at 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2B, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Judge Callie V. S. Granade. The parties are directed to inform the court of the new date set for the mediation conference either by contacting chambers or the clerk. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/26/2014. (tot)
October 28, 2014 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Dfts' 161 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment as set out. The judgment is amended to allow a jury to decide the issue of waiver to the extent that this Court's Order dated 8/12/14 found as a matter of fact or law that Dfts waived certain breaches of the Charter Agreement as set out. Dfts' motion for partial summary judgment remains denied as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 10/28/2014. (tot)
November 10, 2014 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Dfts' 135 Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of A. Clay Rankin, III, as set out, GRANTING Plf's 173 Motion to Exclude the Expert Testimony of William Moore as set out, & DENYING AS MOOT Dfts' 177 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/10/2014. (tot)
November 14, 2014 189 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: Dfts' 158 Objections to Plaintiff's Amended List of Damages & Plf's 164 Response. Motion to exclude contained in Dfts' Objection to Amended List of Damages is DENIED as set out. The remaining objections to the amended list of damages are based on arguments that should be made to the jury at trial and are not legal questions for the Court. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/14/2014. (tot)
January 18, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Dft Nirk Magnate Holding Corp.'s 47 Motion to Dismiss, 47 Motion to Quash Service as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/18/2013. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natures Way Marine, LLC v. EverClear of Ohio, Ltd. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EverClear of Ohio, Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nirk Magnate Holding Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natures Way Marine, LLC
Represented By: Frank J. Dantone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]