Estate of Charles Wasden et al v. Citizens Communications et al

Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Citizens Communications
Plaintiff: Estate of Charles Wasden and Myrtlean Wasden
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00002
Filed: January 2, 2013
 
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Monroe
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2014 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 121 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Accordingly, Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America's motion to dismiss (Doc. 92) is GRANTED and Defendants Principal Financial Group and Principal Life Insurance Companys motion to dismiss (Doc. 99) is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED as to these Defendants for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/11/2014. copies to parties. (sdb)
June 6, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's motion to remand is denied (doc. 27); The motions to dismiss (13,23) are granted and Plaintiffs' state law claims are dismissed; the motion to strike (docs 17, 23) are granted; defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim (doc. 17) is now moot because Lincoln has been dismissed per doc. 69. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/5/2013. (cmj)
October 11, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 77 Motion to Amend Complaint; granting 85 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/11/2013. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Estate of Charles Wasden et al v. Citizens Communications et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: J. Walton Jackson
Represented By: Tara Blake Sprague
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Forrest S. Latta
Represented By: Daniel L. Burkard
Represented By: Ian H. Morrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Communications
Represented By: Sandy G. Robinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Charles Wasden
Represented By: Samuel Joshua Briskman
Represented By: Mack B. Binion
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtlean Wasden
Represented By: Samuel Joshua Briskman
Represented By: Mack B. Binion
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]