FNB Bank v. Park National Corporation et al

Defendant: SE Property Holdings, LLC and Park National Corporation
Plaintiff: FNB Bank
Case Number: 1:2013cv00064
Filed: February 8, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2013 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 53 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/25/2013. Copies to parties. (sdb)
December 27, 2013 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 105 Motion for Summary Judgment by SE Property Holdings, LLC; denying 117 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by FNB Bank. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/27/2013. copies to parties. (sdb)
December 27, 2013 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 132 Motion to Strike certain statements in affidavit of Mike Baggett by SE Property Holdings, LLC.. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/27/2013. copies to parties. (sdb)
December 27, 2013 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 110 Motion for Summary Judgment by Park National Corporation. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/27/2013. copies to parties. (sdb)
December 27, 2013 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 115 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by SE Property Holdings, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/27/2013. copies to parties. (sdb)
January 27, 2014 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 160 Motion to Strike and Exclude The Expert Testimony of Donald Coker. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/27/2014. (tgw)
April 23, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion to Dismiss and Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 4/23/2013. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FNB Bank v. Park National Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Represented By: Bradley Robert Sanders, Jr.
Represented By: Ashley E. Swink
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park National Corporation
Represented By: Allen E. Graham
Represented By: Bradley Robert Sanders, Jr.
Represented By: Ashley E. Swink
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FNB Bank
Represented By: Edward A. Dean
Represented By: Timothy Alan Heisterhagen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]