McCorvey v. Alabama River Cellulose LLC et al

Defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC and Alabama River Cellulose LLC
Plaintiff: David Earl McCorvey, Jr.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00118
Filed: March 12, 2013
 
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Conecuh
Referring Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 117 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/1/2014. (adk)
October 8, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for the parties to file a joint pretrial document by 10/17/2014. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/8/2014. copies to parties. (sdb)
October 10, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 100 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Joseph Robinson and denied as moot as to Robert Tolbert; denying 103 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count One and denied as moot as to Counts Two through Six; denying 127 Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/10/2014. (tgw)
October 24, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 138 Motion to Strike ; granting 144 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/24/2014. (tgw)
October 31, 2014 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 146 Motion in Limine to exclude property damage reports. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 10/31/2014. (tgw)
November 3, 2014 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 149 Motion in Limine. The motion is denied as moot as to the McCollum incident and denied as to the Safe Shed. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/3/2014. (tgw)
November 3, 2014 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 156 Motion in Limine to exclude testimony regarding the absence of other similar accidents. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/3/2014. (tgw)
November 3, 2014 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 153 Motion in Limine to exclude prior criminal arrest, conviction and driving records. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/3/2014. (tgw)
November 3, 2014 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 154 Motion in Limine to exclude certain evidence from certain administrative agencies. The motion is denied as moot as to the Social Security Administration and denied without prejudice as to any "negative determination" by the Department. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/3/2014. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McCorvey v. Alabama River Cellulose LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC
Represented By: Mack B. Binion
Represented By: Sarah Bond Dorger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama River Cellulose LLC
Represented By: Sarah Bond Dorger
Represented By: Mack B. Binion
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Earl McCorvey, Jr.
Represented By: Leila Hirayama Watson
Represented By: G. Rick DiGiorgio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]