Evans v. Ankor Energy LLC et al

Defendant: Ankor Energy LLC, EOG Resources, Inc., Offshore Contract Services, Northstar Offshore Group LLC, Albert P. Hebert and Wood Group Production Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Roy Evans, Jr.
Cross_claimant: Offshore Contract Services
Cross_defendant: Wood Group Production Services, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00182
Filed: April 11, 2013
 
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
 
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Dfts Ankor Energy LLC, Offshore Contract Services, Albert P. Hebert as to Plf's breach of contract claims (Counts III & IV) & against Plf Roy Evans, Jr. Accordingly, Counts III & IV of Plf's Second Amended Complaint are DISMISSED w/prejudice. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/21/2014. (tot)
June 3, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Dft Wood Group Production Services, Inc.'s MOTION to Dismiss (Doc. 1-1 @ 71) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 6/3/2013. (tot)
March 28, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING in part & DENYING in part Dfts' 72 Motion for Summary Judgment as set out. Dfts' Motion is GRANTED IN PART as to the breach of contract claims (Counts III & IV) & DENIED IN PART as to the tort claims (Counts I & II) as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 3/28/2014. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Evans v. Ankor Energy LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ankor Energy LLC
Represented By: Jay Nicklos Robinson
Represented By: Albert Danner Frazer, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas Brent Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EOG Resources, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Contract Services
Represented By: A. Clay Rankin, III
Represented By: Jennifer Stapleton Morgan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar Offshore Group LLC
Represented By: Albert Danner Frazer, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas Brent Baker
Represented By: Jay Nicklos Robinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert P. Hebert
Represented By: William Craig Hamilton
Represented By: Brian P. McCarthy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood Group Production Services, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Whitfield Goolsby
Represented By: Justin W. Parsons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Evans, Jr.
Represented By: Mathew Bernard Richardson
Represented By: Mikalia M. Kott
Represented By: James C. Klick
Represented By: Sidney W. Jackson, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Offshore Contract Services
Represented By: Jennifer Stapleton Morgan
Represented By: A. Clay Rankin, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Wood Group Production Services, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Whitfield Goolsby
Represented By: Justin W. Parsons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]