SouthBark, Inc. et al v. Mobile County Commission et al

Defendant: Mobile County Commission, Connie Hudson, Mercera Ludgood, John Pafenback and Nancy Johnson
Plaintiff: SouthBark, Inc. and Dusty Dean Feller
Case Number: 1:2013cv00183
Filed: April 12, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion to Amend Complaint. The portion of Plaintiffs' complaint moving for injunctive relief is denied, as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/20/2013. (cmj)
September 27, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 39 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 30 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by Connie Hudson, Mercera Ludgood, John Pafenback, Nancy Johnson, Mobile County Commission. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 30) is gr anted as to the following: Plaintiff Dusty Fellers asserted claim of standing; count six (§ 1983 defamation); count seven (§ 1983 defamation); and count fourteen(negligence). Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 30) is denied as to the following: count one (municipal liability under 42 U.S.C. § 1983); count two (free speech); count ten (free speech provision of State constitution); and count thirteen (State common law defamation) Plaintiff Dusty Feller is dismissed as a party to this action and counts six, seven, and fourteen are dismissed as they fail to state a claim upon which this Court can grant relief.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/27/2013. (cmj)
November 12, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 69 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Defendants' motions are DENIED as to Counts 3, 4, 10 and 11 and GRANTED as to Count 13, as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/10/2014. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SouthBark, Inc. et al v. Mobile County Commission et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile County Commission
Represented By: Christina M. Adcock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hudson
Represented By: Christina M. Adcock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercera Ludgood
Represented By: Christina M. Adcock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pafenback
Represented By: Christina M. Adcock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Johnson
Represented By: Christina M. Adcock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SouthBark, Inc.
Represented By: Ishmael Jaffree
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dusty Dean Feller
Represented By: Ishmael Jaffree
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]