In Re: The Matter of Taira Lynn Limited No. 7, LLC

Plaintiff: The Matter of Taira Lynn Limited No. 7, LLC, D&S Charters LLC and D&S Marine Service, L.L.C.
Claimant: Casey Tyson, Justin Kyle Benoit and Maebell Muns Benoit
Case Number: 1:2013cv00318
Filed: June 14, 2013
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Marine-Exoneration from/or Limitation of Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2013 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 103 Motion to Bifurcate; granting 136 Motion for Leave to File sur-reply. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 11/26/2013. (mbp)
December 22, 2014 377 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 365 Motion for Leave to File Answer and Claim filed by Andre Files. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 12/22/2014. (tgw)
February 18, 2015 409 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting the 386 MOTION for Reconsideration of the 377 Order on Motion for Leave to File Answer and Claim filed by Andre Files; granting 365 Motion for Leave to File Answer and Claim. Files is ordered to file his claim by 2/25/2015. Andre Files answer due 3/4/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/18/2015. (tgw)
February 19, 2015 412 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 348 Motion to Dismiss filed by Paul Jones. All claims brought against him by the Tyson, Benoit and Bordelon claimants are dismissed. The Claimants' request for leave to file amended claims (Doc. 356), construed as a motion is denied without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 2/19/2015. (tgw)
August 30, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion to Consolidate. Lead Case No.: 13-318-WS-C, Member Case No.: 13-319-WS-C, 13-321-WS-C, All future pleadings to be filed in the Lead Case. The Clerk is directed to extract documents 1-67 in 13-0319-WS-C, and documents 1-57 in 13-0321-WS-C, and to make those documents a part of the court file in 13-0318-WS-C. The Clerk is directed to statistically close 13-0319-WS-C and 13-0321-WS-C. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/30/2013. (tgw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: The Matter of Taira Lynn Limited No. 7, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Matter of Taira Lynn Limited No. 7, LLC
Represented By: James Rebarchak
Represented By: Catherine Barrett Rice
Represented By: Jefferson R. Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D&S Charters LLC
Represented By: James Rebarchak
Represented By: Catherine Barrett Rice
Represented By: Jefferson R. Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D&S Marine Service, L.L.C.
Represented By: James Rebarchak
Represented By: Catherine Barrett Rice
Represented By: Jefferson R. Tillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Casey Tyson
Represented By: David A. Bagwell
Represented By: David S. Cain, Jr.
Represented By: George W. Finkbohner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Justin Kyle Benoit
Represented By: David A. Bagwell
Represented By: David S. Cain, Jr.
Represented By: George W. Finkbohner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Maebell Muns Benoit
Represented By: David A. Bagwell
Represented By: David S. Cain, Jr.
Represented By: George W. Finkbohner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]