In Re: AEP River Operations LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
J. Russell Flowers, Inc. and AEP River Operations LLC |
Claimant: |
Justin Kyle Benoit, Casey Tyson and Maebell Muns Benoit |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv00321 |
Filed: |
June 18, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama |
Office: |
Mobile Office |
County: |
Mobile |
Presiding Judge: |
William E. Cassady |
Presiding Judge: |
William H. Steele |
Nature of Suit: |
Marine |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Marine-Exoneration from/or Limitation of Liability |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 30, 2013 |
Filing
58
ORDER granting 31 & 32 Motions to Consolidate. Lead Case No.: 13-318-WS-C, Member Case No.: 13-319-WS-C, 13-321-WS-C. All future pleadings to be filed in the Lead Case. The Clerk is directed to extract documents 1-67 in 13-0319-WS-C, and documents 1-57 in 13-0321-WS-C, and to make those documents a part of the court file in 13-0318-WS-C. The Clerk is directed to statistically close 13-0319-WS-C and 13-0321-WS-C. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/30/2013. (tgw)
|
August 5, 2013 |
Filing
34
ORDER re: 30 Motion to Clarify or, if necessary, to amend the limitation injunction. The motion to clarify is granted, as set out. The motion to amend the injunction limitation is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/5/2013. (tgw)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: In Re: AEP River Operations LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Claimant: Justin Kyle Benoit |
Represented By: |
David A. Bagwell |
Represented By: |
David S. Cain, Jr. |
Represented By: |
George W. Finkbohner, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Claimant: Casey Tyson |
Represented By: |
David A. Bagwell |
Represented By: |
David S. Cain, Jr. |
Represented By: |
George W. Finkbohner, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Claimant: Maebell Muns Benoit |
Represented By: |
David A. Bagwell |
Represented By: |
David S. Cain, Jr. |
Represented By: |
George W. Finkbohner, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: J. Russell Flowers, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Marion A. Quina, Jr. |
Represented By: |
John P. Kavanagh, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Clarence William Emory |
Represented By: |
Trevor Matthew Cutaiar |
Represented By: |
Adam Sanderson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: AEP River Operations LLC |
Represented By: |
Adam Sanderson |
Represented By: |
Marion A. Quina, Jr. |
Represented By: |
John P. Kavanagh, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Clarence William Emory |
Represented By: |
Trevor Matthew Cutaiar |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?