Searcy et al v. Bentley et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Cari D. Searcy and Kimberly McKeand
Defendant: Robert Bentley, Luther Strange, Don Davis, Catherine M. Donald and Nancy T. Buckner
Case Number: 1:2014cv00208
Filed: May 6, 2014
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: Katherine P. Nelson
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 34 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as the opinion of this Court. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/19/2014. (mab)
August 28, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court Order, in accordance w/ 40 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, Plfs' claims against Dfts Bentley, Donald & Buckner in their individual & official capacities are DISMISSED w/prejudice as set out, & Plfs' claims against Luther Strange, III, in his individual capacity are DISMISSED w/prejudice as set out. The parties are directed to use style as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/28/2014. (tot)
January 23, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, GRANTING Plaintiffs' 21 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING Defendant's 21 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding that Ala. Const. Art. I Section 36.03 (2006) and Ala. Code 1975 Section 30-1-19 to be unconstitutional; and enjoining defendant from enforcing those laws. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/23/2015. (mab)
January 23, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of plaintiffs, Cari D. Searcy and Kimberly McKeand and against defendant, Luther Strange, in his capacity as Attorney General for the State of Alabama. ALA. CONST. ART. I, § 36.03 (2006) and ALA. CODE 1975 § 30-1-19 are hereby DECLARED to be unconstitutional, and defendant is hereby ENJOINED from enforcing those laws. Costs are to be taxed against the defendant. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/23/2015. (mab)
January 25, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered re: 55 Motion to Stay. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Courts Order of Injunction and Judgment (Docs. 53 & 54 ) are STAYED FOR 14 DAYS. If no action is taken by the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals to extend or lift the stay within that time period, this courts stay will be lifted on February 9, 2105 as further set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/25/2015. (jlr)
February 3, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plfs' 67 Motion to Lift Stay as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/3/2015. (tot)
February 9, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plfs' 71 Motion for Contempt & Immediate Relief as set out. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 2/9/2015. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Searcy et al v. Bentley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cari D. Searcy
Represented By: Christine Cassie Hernandez(Designation Retained)
Represented By: David Graham Kennedy(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly McKeand
Represented By: Christine Cassie Hernandez(Designation Retained)
Represented By: David Graham Kennedy(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luther Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Davis
Represented By: Jason Kirk Hagmaier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine M. Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy T. Buckner
Represented By: Felicia Marshea Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]