Davis v. The Bank of New York et al

Plaintiff: Mack Davis, Jr.
Defendant: The Bank of New York and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2012cv00200
Filed: March 20, 2012
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Selma Office
County: Dallas
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court Order GRANTING in part Plf's 17 Amended MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint. If Plf intends to amend his complaint in this court, he should file an amended complaint on or before 9/11/2012. Dfts' answers to the amended complaint should be filed within 14 days of receipt of the amendment. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/4/2012. (tot)
December 3, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 21 Stipulation of Dismissal. Plf's claims against The Bank of New York, f/k/a The Bank of New York Trustee, and Bank of America, N.A., are DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE, each party to bear his/its own costs, expenses, & fees. Plf is remind ed that the deadline for service on Dft Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC SLS will expire on 1/8/2013. Plf is to file a notice of service attempt as to Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC SLS on or before 12/7/2012. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/3/2012. (tot)
July 23, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. 38 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC SLS is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/23/2013. (tot)
July 23, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Dft Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC SLS against Plf Mack Davis, Jr. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 7/23/2013. (tot)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. The Bank of New York et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mack Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Danny West Crenshaw
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York
Represented By: Kathryn Dietrich Perreault
Represented By: John David Collins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: John David Collins
Represented By: Kathryn Dietrich Perreault
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]