Byler v. Alaskan Leader

Plaintiff: Jerry L. Byler
Defendant: Alaskan Leader
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00055
Filed: March 16, 2010
 
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
Presiding Judge: H. Russel Holland
Referring Judge: John D. Roberts
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:761 Shipping: Damages for Death on High Seas
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2010 116 Featured Case JDR ORDER granting Motion 100 to Strike:* The Motions for Arrest Warrants and Motions to Appoint a Substitute Custodian are Stricken; * Court has In Rem Jurisdiction over this matter;* Plaintiff has made a prima facie showing suf ficient to satisfy the threshold requirements; * There is insufficient evidence to prevent the subsequent administration of the Estate at this time; * There is insufficient evidence at this time to show that the Estate has waived its right to pursue this action; * The previous Findings regarding the appurtenances to the Vessel stand. Order Signed by Judge John D. Roberts. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
November 12, 2010 117 Featured Case JDR ORDER denying Motion 109 to Vacate Order. * The findings of the magistrate judge stand pending alteration by the District Court Judge should he choose to make any. * This order, coupled with the Order at Docket 116, intends to rule on all motions ripe for decision by the magistrate judge. Any further motions regarding review of these issues will be referred to the assigned District Judge for his determination. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
February 15, 2011 154 Featured Case JDR ORDER denying Motion 125 to Compel Disclosure or for Preclusion of Evidence. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
February 16, 2011 159 Featured Case JDR ORDER denying Motion 129 for Approval of Payment of Commission. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
April 1, 2011 177 Featured Case JDR ORDER denying Motion 155 for Approval of Brokerage Agreement. Signed by Judge John D. Roberts. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
June 14, 2011 193 Featured Case JDR ORDER granting Motion 172 to Strike Expert Witnesses D. Lacey and A. Johnson from Plaintiff's witness list. Order signed by Judge John D. Roberts. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
September 28, 2011 214 Featured Case JDR MINUTE ORDER directing plaintiff to file a Status Report with specificity as to the pending summary judgment 196 motion and/or possible settlement, on or before 10/7/2011. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
October 18, 2011 219 Featured Case MJ ROBERTS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Stipulation 218 for Dismissal. MJ recommends dismissal be entered and all pending motions be denied as moot. RR filed as a final, no objection to follow. Matter to be forwarded to the assigned district judge for his determination. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
October 18, 2011 220 Featured Case ORDER granting stip for dism w/prej; pending mots denied as moot. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 10/18/11. (PRR, COURT STAFF)
September 8, 2010 94 Featured Case JDR ORDER granting Motion 71 to Create Interim Receivership and/or Operate Vessels. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
September 9, 2010 95 Featured Case JDR AMENDED ORDER: Order at Docket 94 Regarding Motion 71 for Creation of Receivership is Amended to reflect the correct case caption and date of entry of order by Judge Roberts. (JAM, Chambers Staff)
September 20, 2010 96 Featured Case JDR ORDER Re Motion 74 for Miscellaneous Relief. Renewed motions addressing substitute custodian and in rem arrest of vessel due on or before October 4, 2010. (JAM, Chambers Staff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Byler v. Alaskan Leader
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry L. Byler
Represented By: John E. Casperson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaskan Leader
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]