Independent Bank of Texas v. M/V JANICE RUTH II, Official Number 1118444 et al

Defendant: M/V JANICE RUTH II, Official Number 1118444 and The Martha Reynolds Trust
Plaintiff: Independent Bank of Texas
Case Number: 3:2011cv00128
Filed: June 14, 2011
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: Timothy M. Burgess
Referring Judge: John D. Roberts
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JDR ORDER Re: Posting of Notice of Arrest; Notice of Filing Petition in Bankruptcy and STAYING ACTION. U.S. Marshal to Re-post Notice of Vessel Arrest. Signed by Judge John D. Roberts. cc: USM (JAM, Chambers Staff)
November 21, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court Report and Recommendation
December 6, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court JDR ORDER: Counsel to file Status Report due by 1/13/2012. Sale scheduled for 12/15/2011 is vacated in light of the vessel sinking. Signed by Judge John D. Roberts on 12/5/2011. cc: USM(Roberts, John)
December 6, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendations re 47 and GRANTING 40 Motion for Default Judgment M/V JANICE RUTH II, Official Number 1116444 in rem and The Martha Reynolds Trust in personam. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 12/6/11. (SRL, CHAMBERS STAFF)
August 1, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court Report and Recommendation
August 6, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 66 Report and Recommendations Granting Docket 65. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 8/6/12. (SRL, CHAMBERS STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Independent Bank of Texas v. M/V JANICE RUTH II, Official Number 1118444 et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V JANICE RUTH II, Official Number 1118444
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Martha Reynolds Trust
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Independent Bank of Texas
Represented By: Steven J. Shamburek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]