Shell Oil Company v. Greenpeace, Inc. Featured Case

Defendant: Greenpeace, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shell Oil Company
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00042
Filed: February 24, 2012
 
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: Sharon L. Gleason
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2012 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ON SHORTENED TIME Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Extend Defendants' Briefing Deadline filed by Shell Oil Company. (Leppo, Jeffrey)
March 7, 2012 34 NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED ORDER by Greenpeace, Inc. re 31 MOTION to Expedite ON SHORTENED TIME MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Moberly, Michael)
March 7, 2012 Docket Annotation re 31 MOTION to Expedite ON SHORTENED TIME MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; the parties are advised that the proposed order that was submitted contained the attorney's s/signature on the signature line. Counsel for Greenpeace should submit a prepared Notice of Lodging and attach an UNSIGNED Proposed Order to the Notice. Notice of Lodging should be linked back to the Motion at Docket 31. Counsel for Greenspeace should also email UNSIGNED Word or WordPerfect Proposed Order to the judicial officer's email address. (CME, COURT STAFF)
March 6, 2012 33 NOTICE OF FILING UNSIGNED AFFIDAVIT by Greenpeace, Inc. re 32 Affidavit (Moberly, Michael)
March 6, 2012 32 AFFIDAVIT of COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF re 31 MOTION to Expedite ON SHORTENED TIME MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ON SHORTENED TIME by Greenpeace, Inc.. (Moberly, Michael)
March 6, 2012 31 MOTION to Expedite ON SHORTENED TIME MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Greenpeace, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Moberly, Michael) Modified on 3/7/2012 to Create relationship to document #30 and to reflect error, see 03/07/2012 Docket Annotation below (CME, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2012 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ON SHORTENED TIME by Greenpeace, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Moberly, Michael) Modified on 3/7/2012 to Create relationship to document #6. (CME, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2012 29 Receipt number ANC005320 in the amount of $ $5000.00 received on 3/1/2012 from Stoel Rives regarding 28 Notice of Filing Cash Bond. (TYM, COURT STAFF)
March 1, 2012 28 NOTICE of Filing Cash Bond by Shell Oil Company re 27 Order on Motion for TRO, (Torgerson, James)
March 1, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 6 and scheduling a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction for March 14, 2012 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/01/2012. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
February 29, 2012 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sharon L. Gleason: Motion Hearing held on 2/29/2012 re First Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 6 matter taken UNDER ADVISEMENT, written ruling to issue. (SCD, COURT STAFF)
February 29, 2012 25 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Defendant's Motion to Continue Hearing 21 . Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 02/29/2012. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF) Modified on 2/29/2012 to create relationship to document #6 (PRR, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Continue Hearing FILED ON SHORTENED TIME Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Continue Hearing filed by Shell Oil Company. (Leppo, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2012 23 AFFIDAVIT of COUNSEL re 21 MOTION to Continue Hearing FILED ON SHORTENED TIME by Greenpeace, Inc.. (Moberly, Michael)
February 28, 2012 22 NOTICE OF FILING UNSIGNED AFFIDAVIT by Greenpeace, Inc. re 21 MOTION to Continue Hearing FILED ON SHORTENED TIME (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Moberly, Michael)
February 28, 2012 21 MOTION to Continue Hearing FILED ON SHORTENED TIME by Greenpeace, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Moberly, Michael)
February 28, 2012 20 NOTICE Plaintiff's Supplemental Submissions in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Shell Oil Company re 16 Order on Motion for Hearing, 6 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65)First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (REDLINED) [Amended Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, # 2 Proposed Order [Amended Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Temporary Restraining Order)(Leppo, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2012 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca J. Hozubin on behalf of Greenpeace, Inc. (Hozubin, Rebecca)
February 28, 2012 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Moberly on behalf of Greenpeace, Inc. (Moberly, Michael)
February 28, 2012 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Verified Complaint; First Amended Verified Complaint Affidavit of Proof of Service (Rule 4(l)) served on Greenpeace, Inc. on 02/27/2012, filed by Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Leppo, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2012 16 Featured Case ORDER Granting Motion for Hearing on Shortened Time Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order 12 and setting hearing for February 29, 2012 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 02/28/2012. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF) Modified on 2/28/2012 to create relationship to document #6 (PRR, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2012 15 Notice to Counsel re 10 and 11 Declarations filed by Shell Oil Company. A review of the documents submitted at dkts 10 and 11 confirms that they are over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the documents has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 10.1(b) and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filing at dkt 10 and 11. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf header on each page. (PRR, COURT STAFF)
February 27, 2012 Summons Issued as to Greenpeace, Inc. (TYM, COURT STAFF)
February 27, 2012 14 Unissued summons re Defendant Greenpeace, Inc., (Attachments: # 1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Greenpeace, Inc., # 2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Greenpeace, Inc.)(TYM, COURT STAFF)
February 27, 2012 13 AFFIDAVIT of Jeffrey W. Leppo In Support of Motion for Hearing on Shortened Time Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Local Rule 7.2(c)) re 12 First MOTION for Hearing re 6 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65)First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and PreFirst MOTION for Hearing re 6 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65)First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and PreFirst MOTION for Hearing re 6 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65)First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Pre by Shell Oil Company. (Leppo, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2012 12 First MOTION for Hearing re 6 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65)First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65) Motion for Hearing on SHORTENED Time Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for a Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Local Rule 7.2(c)) by Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Hearing on Shortened Time Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Local Rule 7.2(c)))(Leppo, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2012 11 DECLARATION of Peter Scott re 6 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65)First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65) by Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Part 1 of 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Part 2 of 2, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit N - Part 1 of 7, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit N - Part 2 of 7, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit N - Part 3 of 7, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit N - Part 4 of 7, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit N - Part 5 of 7, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit N - Part 6 of 7, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit N - Part 7 of 7, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 24 Appendix Index to Exhibits)(Leppo, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2012 10 DECLARATION of Mark W. Duplantis re 6 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65)First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65) by Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 1 of 12, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 2 of 12, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 3 of 12, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 4 of 12, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 5 of 12, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 6 of 12, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 7 of 12, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 8 of 12, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 9 of 12, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 10 of 12, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 11 of 12, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 12 of 12, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit C - Part 1 of 2, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit C - Part 2 of 2, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Leppo, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2012 9 DECLARATION of Joseph A. Leone re 6 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65)First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65) by Shell Oil Company. (Leppo, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2012 8 NOTICE Certification by Counsel of Efforts Made to Give Notice (Rule 65(b)(1)) by Shell Oil Company re 6 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65)First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65) (Leppo, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2012 7 MEMORANDUM Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65) by Shell Oil Company 6 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65)First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65) filed by Shell Oil Company. (Leppo, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2012 6 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Rule 65) by Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Temporary Restraining Order & Preliminary Injunction)(Leppo, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2012 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shell Oil Company. (Leppo, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2012 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Verified Complaint against Greenpeace, Inc., filed by Shell Oil Company.(Leppo, Jeffrey)
February 24, 2012 Summons Issued as to Greenpeace, Inc. (TYM, COURT STAFF)
February 24, 2012 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Greenpeace, Inc., (Attachments: # 1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Greenpeace, Inc., # 2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Greenpeace, Inc.)(TYM, COURT STAFF)
February 24, 2012 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (TYM, COURT STAFF)
February 24, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Greenpeace, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350. Receipt No. ANC005294), filed by Shell Gulf of Mexico, Inc. and Shell Offshore, Inc.(TYM, COURT STAFF) Modified on 2/27/2012 to correct Receipt Number (TYM, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Shell Oil Company v. Greenpeace, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenpeace, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Moberly
Represented By: Rebecca J. Hozubin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Leppo
Represented By: Ryan P. Steen
Represented By: James E. Torgerson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]