Anchorage, a Municipal Corporation v. Integrated Concepts and Research Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Anchorage, a Municipal Corporation
Defendant: Integrated Concepts and Research Corporation, PND Engineers, Inc. and CH2M Hill Alaska, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00063
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: Alaska District Court
Office: Anchorage Office
County: Anchorage
Presiding Judge: Sharon L. Gleason
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2015 188 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: re PND's Motion for Summary Judgment - Economic Loss Doctrine 91 and CH2M Hill's Motion for Summary Judgment 94 . Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/04/2015. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 23, 2015 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: re Fault Allocation Motions: PND's Motion for Rule of Law on Allocation of Fault is DENIED 93 ; CH2M Hill's Motion for Order Regarding AS 09.17.080 Fault Allocation to Maritime Administration and Construction Contractors or, Alternatively, For Leave to Amend to Add Third-Party Defendants is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part 97 (the Third-Party Complaint as Ordered shall be filed within 14 days of the date of this Order); ICRC's Motion for Rule of Law is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part 101 (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/23/2015. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
November 21, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: re Motion to Remand and Related Motions: 55 Motion for Leave to File, DENIED; 65 Motion to Strike, DENIED; 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court, DENIED (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 11/21/2013. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 4, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: denying Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 12 . Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 03/04/2014. (AEM, CHAMBERS STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anchorage, a Municipal Corporation v. Integrated Concepts and Research Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anchorage, a Municipal Corporation
Represented By: Bennett D. Greenberg
Represented By: Robert P. Owens
Represented By: Jason N. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated Concepts and Research Corporation
Represented By: Adam W. Cook
Represented By: Max D. Garner
Represented By: David Karl Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PND Engineers, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce Eric Davison
Represented By: Jahna M. Lindemuth
Represented By: Lisa M. Marchese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CH2M Hill Alaska, Inc.
Represented By: Bennett J Lee
Represented By: Christopher A. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.