Klosterman

Plaintiff: Gina Marie Klosterman
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
 
Case Number: 2:2009cv02068
Filed: September 30, 2009
 
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2010 20 Featured Case ORDER denying 14 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/29/2010.(NVO)
April 20, 2010 22 Featured Case ORDER - Defendant's decision denying benefits is reversed. The case is remanded to Defendant for further proceedings. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/10. (KMG)
December 1, 2010 28 Featured Case ORDER denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/1/10.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Klosterman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Marie Klosterman
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]