Harout Karamanougian v. Eric Holder et al

Defendant: Phyllis Coven, Eric Holder, Jr., Alejandro Mayorkas and Janet Napolitano
Plaintiff: Harout Karamanougian
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv02249
Filed: March 28, 2013
 
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Dolly M. Gee
Referring Judge: Michael R. Wilner
 
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. The Plaintiff is reminded to timely seek entry of default, if appropriate. (rfi)
September 12, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 10/3/2013. (rfi)
July 29, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 8/19/2013. (rfi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Harout Karamanougian v. Eric Holder et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Coven
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder, Jr.
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harout Karamanougian
Represented By: Elsa Ines Martinez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]