Diaz v. Vasquez, et al.

Defendant: J. Gallagher, Vasquez, R Morales, C.M. Heck, Lozano, Beltran and Onyeje
Plaintiff: Miguel Enrique Diaz
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00732
Filed: May 4, 2012
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Gerald B. Cohn
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Regarding Exhaustion signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 7/12/2012. Show Cause Response due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
November 9, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND and ORDER DENYING 2 , 6 Motions for Preliminary Injunction, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 11/9/2012. First Amended Complaint due within twenty-one (21) days. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Form). (Jessen, A)
January 9, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE as to Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Comply With a Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 1/9/2013. Show Cause Response due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
February 25, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION, With Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A Boone on 2/25/2013. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
August 13, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 25 Motion to Proceed IFP as MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/12/2013. (Sant Agata, S)
May 14, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SUBMIT Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within 45 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gerald B. Cohn on 5/14/2012. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Application). (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Diaz v. Vasquez, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gallagher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vasquez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Morales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.M. Heck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lozano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beltran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onyeje
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Enrique Diaz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]