Marshawn Govan v. City of Clovis et al

Defendant: City of Clovis, Vince Weibert and John Willow
Plaintiff: Marshawn Govan
Case Number: 1:2013cv00547
Filed: April 16, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING, without prejudice, plaintiff's motions/requests for pro se access to the electronic case management system, documents 10 and 11 . Plaintiff is further ORDERED to file all documents in this matter in paper format. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/6/2013. (Rooney, M)
June 24, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING, without prejudice, plaintiff's motions to compel, documents 22 and 23 , and document 24 , as untimely. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 6/24/2013. (Rooney, M)
July 19, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO DISMISS CLAIMS (Doc. 15) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 19, 2013. (Munoz, I)
July 31, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING, as untimely, Notice of Motion of Plaintiff Opposition of Defendants Motion TBD, Plaintiff's Statement of [F]acts, Memorandum of Points and Authorities, document 29 . Plaintiff is DIRECTED "to file and serve either (1) an amended complaint; or (2) a statement that he elects to proceed only on the complaint's fifth, eighth, and ninth claims as pled in the complaint," in compliance with the Court's 7/19/2013 Order to Dismiss Claims, document 28 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 7/31/2013. (Rooney, M)
August 23, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING defendants' request to continue the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 9/10/2013, pursuant to notice that a motion to dismiss will be filed by 8/30/2013. As such, the Initial Scheduling will now be held on 11/13/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1 (SMS) before Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder. The parties are reminded to file a joint scheduling report one full week prior to the hearing. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 8/23/2013. (Rooney, M)
October 7, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Dismiss 38 Claims with Prejudice and Judgment in Favor of Defendants Weiber and Willow signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/07/2013. Vince Weibert and John Willow terminated from Action. (Flores, E)
November 12, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING Remaining Claim and Judgment as to 49 Motion to Dismiss; ORDERED to enter Judgment In Favor of Defendant: City of Clovis and Against Plaintiff: Marshawn Govan, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/12/2013. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshawn Govan v. City of Clovis et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Clovis
Represented By: Jenell Arlene VanBindsbergen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vince Weibert
Represented By: Jenell Arlene VanBindsbergen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Willow
Represented By: Jenell Arlene VanBindsbergen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshawn Govan
Represented By: Hadi Ty Kharazi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]