Forsey v. Clinton et al

Defendant: An Le, Hilary Rodham Clinton and Janet Napolitano
Plaintiff: Devin Forsey
Case Number: 2:2011cv02936
Filed: November 4, 2011
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/9/2012 ORDERING that the defendants' Answer is due on 4/4/2012, and that the scheduling conference is reset to 4/30/2012 at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall file their status reports 14 days prior to the status conference. (Zignago, K.)
April 6, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/5/2012 ORDERING that the defendants' Answer is due on 7/5/2012, and that the scheduling conference is reset to 7/16/2012 at 2:00 p.m. The parties shall file status reports 14 days prior to the status conference. (Zignago, K.)
July 9, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/9/2012 ORDERING pursuant to the joint stipulation this case is DISMISSED, each side to bear its own fees and costs. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forsey v. Clinton et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: An Le
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilary Rodham Clinton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Forsey
Represented By: Mary Beth Kaufman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]