Cohen v. Newsom et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Cohen
Defendant: Gavin Newsom, Heather Fong, City & County of San Francisco and Go Daddy Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv01443
Filed: March 13, 2008
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2008 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2009 02:30 PM. Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2009 09:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/9/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008) Modified on 10/14/2008 (ys, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 32 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
March 31, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: REMAINING ISSUES (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 31, 2009 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen v. Newsom et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Cohen
Represented By: Daniel A. Horowitz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Represented By: Warren Metlitzky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Fong
Represented By: Warren Metlitzky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of San Francisco
Represented By: Warren Metlitzky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Go Daddy Group, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Gregory Mendonca
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]