Jackson et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Espanola Jackson, Paul Colvin, Thomas Boyer, Larry Barsetti, David Golden, Noemi Margaret Robinson, National Rifle Association of America, Inc. and San Francisco Veteran Police Officers Association
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Gavin Newsom and Heather Fong
Case Number: 3:2009cv02143
Filed: May 15, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2011 101 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2012 10:00 AM.; Pretrial Conference set for 2/14/2013 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 2/25/2013 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 2/25/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/18/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
May 23, 2012 122 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 120 EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/23/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
August 17, 2012 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Seeborg denying 109 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
December 31, 2012 154 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 152 STAYING FURTHER DISTRICT COURT PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/31/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2012)
August 14, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE re 15 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Thomas Boyer, Noemi Margaret Robinson, Paul Colvin, Espanola Jackson, David Golden, Larry Barsetti, National Rifle Association of America, Inc., San Francisco Veteran Police Officers Association. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/14/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
September 13, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 29 GRANTING MOTION TO LIFT STAY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 09/13/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 27, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 38 MOTION TO EXTEND RESPONSE TIME AND PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/27/10. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
November 29, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/29/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
December 16, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 43 DENYING MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/16/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 16, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: 55 SETTING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/16/10. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 29, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' FIFTH CLAIM FOR RELIEF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/29/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
January 28, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 58 EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Stipulation filed by Gavin Newsom, George Gascon, City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/28/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
April 8, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE AND REQUEST FURTHER BRIEFING. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/8/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
May 6, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 78 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/6/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
September 27, 2011 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF STANDING, GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND MOOT CLAIM. Case Management Conference set for 11/3/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/26/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
October 6, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/6/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
November 8, 2011 98 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTIES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/7/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Espanola Jackson
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Colvin
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Boyer
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Barsetti
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Golden
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noemi Margaret Robinson
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Rifle Association of America, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Veteran Police Officers Association
Represented By: Carl Dawson Michel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Fong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]