Masterobjects, Inc. v. Microsoft Corp Featured Case

MasterObjects filed a patent infringement suit against Microsoft, claiming that its 'request-response-loop' patent is being infringed by Bing, Internet Explorer, Windows Phone, IE browser toolbar, and mobile apps.

Defendant: Microsoft Corp
Plaintiff: Masterobjects, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv02402
Filed: May 17, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2011 28 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 27 Stipulation filed by Masterobjects, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/23/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 22, 2011 27 STIPULATION "AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS" by Masterobjects, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
September 6, 2011 26 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Claims Construction Hearing set for 4/26/2012 01:30 PM. Claim Construction Discovery due by 1/13/2012. Tutorial Hearing set for 4/24/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 1/27/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/6/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 25 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/30/2011 before Edward M. Chen. Tutorial is set for 4/24/12 at 2:30 p.m. Claim Construction Hearing is set for 4/26/12 at 1:30 p.m. Court will set the briefing schedule and hearing date on the motion for summary judgment on priority date of '326 and other deadlines in the case management conference order.(Date Filed: 9/6/2011). () (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/6/2011)
September 6, 2011 24 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Chen) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
August 29, 2011 23 MOTION of Betty H. Chen for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611064017) filed by Microsoft Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 23, 2011 22 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Masterobjects, Inc.. (Bishop, George) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
August 16, 2011 21 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim "PLAINTIFF MASTEROBJECTS, INC.'S AMENDED ANSWER TO DEFENDANT MICROSOFT CORP.'S COUNTERCLAIMS" byMasterobjects, Inc.. (Bishop, George) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 9, 2011 20 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/9/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2011)
August 8, 2011 19 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Microsoft Corp (Hunsaker, Kelly) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 8, 2011 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hunsaker, Kelly) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
August 3, 2011 17 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim "PLAINTIFF MASTEROBJECTS, INC.'S ANSWER TO DEFENDANT MICROSOFT CORP.'S COUNTERCLAIMS" byMasterobjects, Inc.. (Bishop, George) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 3, 2011 16 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by MasterObjects (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
August 1, 2011 15 MICROSOFT CORPORATIONS' CORRECTED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Masterobjects, Inc. byMicrosoft Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kalay, Leeron) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
July 27, 2011 14 CLERKS NOTICE resetting CMC (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 8, 2011 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Microsoft Corp (Kalay, Leeron) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 12 MICROSOFT CORPORATION'S ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Masterobjects, Inc. byMicrosoft Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kalay, Leeron) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Juanita R. Brooks for Microsoft Corporation (Brooks, Juanita) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Leeron Kalay for Microsoft Corporation (Kalay, Leeron) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 8, 2011 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly C. Hunsaker for Microsoft Corporation (Hunsaker, Kelly) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
June 8, 2011 8 STANDING ORDERS (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 2, 2011 7 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 6 Stipulation filed by Masterobjects, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/2/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 1, 2011 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Masterobjects, Inc.. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 25, 2011 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Masterobjects, Inc.. Microsoft Corp served on 5/18/2011, answer due 6/8/2011. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 18, 2011 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 17, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
May 17, 2011 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2011 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
May 17, 2011 2 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Masterobjects, Inc. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
May 17, 2011 1 COMPLAINT; summons issued against Microsoft Corp (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611059925). Filed by Masterobjects, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masterobjects, Inc. v. Microsoft Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masterobjects, Inc.
Represented By: George F. Bishop
Represented By: Spencer Hosie
Represented By: William Patrick Nelson
Represented By: Diane Sue Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.