United States Of America v. $49,000 In United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: $49,000 In United States Currency
Claimant: Joseph Marasco
Case Number: 3:2012cv03973
Filed: July 27, 2012
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 11 Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States Of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/6/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
June 5, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY; CONTINUING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 8/22/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2013 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/5/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
August 2, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2013 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/2/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 29, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2013 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/29/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
December 13, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CMC. Status Report due by 12/18/2013. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/13/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 19, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Case Management Statement due by 2/27/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/6/2014 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/19/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
January 10, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 23 Stipulation for Dismissal and Judgment. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. $49,000 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Patricia Jean Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $49,000 In United States Currency
Represented By: Stuart Douglas Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joseph Marasco
Represented By: Sara Ellen Rief
Represented By: Jeff F Wozniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.