United States Of America v. Clark

Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Kevin Clark
Case Number: 3:2013cv00495
Filed: February 5, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 5, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
May 8, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED DISMISSAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 12 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
February 26, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/4/2013 08:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 3/14/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 25, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
April 3, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED ORDER re 5 Order to Show Cause (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013) Modified on 4/3/2013 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ENFORCING SUMMONS. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/4/13. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Cynthia Lewis Stier
Represented By: Thomas Moore
Represented By: Melinda Haag
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]