Cromwell et al v. United States Of America

Plaintiff: John Eaton Cromwell, Jr. and Elisabeth Nergaard Olsen
Defendant: United States Of America
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00519
Filed: January 4, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
 
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing clerk to issue refund re 12 Letter filed by Elisabeth Nergaard Olsen, John Eaton Cromwell, Jr.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/19/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2013)
May 30, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation to Continue Hearing and Briefing and CMC) filed by United States Of America, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation to Continue Hearing and Briefing), 14 Amended MOTION for Return of Property with Exhibits. Responses due by 8/1/2013. Replies due by 8/8/2013. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco befor e Hon. Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 5/30/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
September 17, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Dismissing Case filed by Elisabeth Nergaard Olsen, John Eaton Cromwell, Jr.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/17/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cromwell et al v. United States Of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Eaton Cromwell, Jr.
Represented By: Edward Michael Burch
Represented By: David Martin Michael
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Nergaard Olsen
Represented By: Edward Michael Burch
Represented By: David Martin Michael
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: David Countryman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]