Martins v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al

Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Janet Napolitano and Alejandro Mayorkas
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Martins
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00591
Filed: February 11, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
 
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 14 the parties' proposed briefing schedule and selection of a magistrate judge for a settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/26/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
June 19, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER regarding 20 Defendants' motions for partial judgment on the pleadings, for dismissal of claims against certain federal defendants, and to quash discovery request. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/19/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
July 1, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER for supplemental information. The government is ordered to file a chart with the pages at issue for each asylum applicant no later than July 2, 2013, at noon. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/1/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
July 3, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 17 Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. See order for details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 7/3/2013.(lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
September 19, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER ordering defendant to complete the approval process by 10/18/2013. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 09/18/2013. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
October 25, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: A Joint Case Management Statement (with updated information only) due by 11/14/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 10/25/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
November 19, 2013 42 Featured Case SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/19/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
December 20, 2013 47 Featured Case ORDER re 46 Settlement Agreement Regarding Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/20/2013. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Martins v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Martins
Represented By: Robin L. Goldfaden
Represented By: Jeffrey D Glassner
Represented By: Thomas R. Burke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]