Alexander v. United States Of America

Plaintiff: Ann Marie Alexander
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 3:2013cv00678
Filed: February 14, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IN PART PURSUANT TO THE COURTS DUTY UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/26/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
August 5, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 15 Motion to Dismiss; and denying 23 Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 8, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Dkt. No. 42); ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL (Dkt. No. 35); ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magsitrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/8/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
September 12, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND STAYING DISCOVERY AND FILINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/12/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
January 6, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND; DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 21, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re C-13-5251 EDL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/20/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Marie Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.