Kinney v. State Bar of California et al

Defendant: City of Los Angeles, State Bar of California, Luis A. Lavin and Roger W. Boren
Plaintiff: Charles Kinney
Case Number: 3:2013cv01396
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND TO ADD DEFENDANTS; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 9, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2013)
July 3, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CLARIFY; VACATING AUGUST 16, 2013 HEARING; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from July 12, 2013 to September 20, 2013. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than September 13, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 3, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
July 31, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CLAIMS AGAINST REMAINING DEFENDANTS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than August 16, 2013, why plaintiff's claims against the City of Los An geles, California Superior Court Judge Luis A. Lavin, and California Court of Appeal Justice Roger W. Boren should not be dismissed for failure to serve within the time required by Rule 4(m). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 31, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
August 21, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO SERVE; SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CLAIMS AGAINST JUDGE LAVIN AND JUSTICE BOREN. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing and no later than September 20, 2013, why his claims against Judge Lavin and Justice Boren should not be dismissed. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 21, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
September 16, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference currently scheduled for September 20, 2013 is continued to November 15, 2013. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than November 8, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 16, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 27, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JUSTICE ROGER BOREN AND JUDGE LUIS LAVIN'S MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 27, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
October 2, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING CITY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO AMEND; VACATING HEARING. To the extent the complaint seeks to enjoin enforcement of orders finding plaintiff to be a vexa tious litigant, the complaint is dismissed without leave to amend; in all other respects, the City's motion to dismiss is denied. Plaintiff's request for leave to amend is granted, and plaintiff shall file his First Amended Complaint no lat er than October 18, 2013. The Case Management Conference is continued from November 15, 2013 to January 10, 2014; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than January 3, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 2, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
December 13, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON CITY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 13, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
December 23, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART CITY OF LOS ANGELES' MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE AMENDED COMPLAINT. To the extent the motion seeks dismissal of the due process and equal protection claims in the First and Second Causes of Ac tion, the motion is granted, and said claims are dismissed without further leave to amend. To the extent the motion seeks dismissal of the retaliation claim in the First and Second Causes of Action, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 23, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
January 13, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/10/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
February 28, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 28, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
March 29, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 29, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2013: # 1 Certificate of Service) (tlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinney v. State Bar of California et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Bar of California
Represented By: Danielle Adoracion Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis A. Lavin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger W. Boren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Kinney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]