Lilly et al v. Jamba Juice Company et al

Defendant: Jamba Juice Company and Inventure Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Cox and Aleta Lilly
Case Number: 3:2013cv02998
Filed: June 28, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) filed by Inventure Foods, Inc., Jamba Juice Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 1, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 4, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING THE OCTOBER 23, 2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR THE SAME DATE AND TIME AS THE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by David Cox, Aleta Lilly. Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 4, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 15, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 22 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by David Cox, Aleta Lilly filed by David Cox, Aleta Lilly. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 15, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
November 18, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING DEADLINE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar, denying 11 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
February 3, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 27 Proposed Order filed by Jamba Juice Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 3, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 12, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Motion For Class Certification) filed by Inventure Foods, Inc., Jamba Juice Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 12, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
April 29, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Amending Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date on Motion for Class Certification filed by Jamba Juice Company. Responses due by 6/30/2014. Replies due by 7/30/2014. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 29, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
July 28, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT DOES NOT LACK SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Show Cause Response due by 8/11/2014. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 27, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
September 18, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 29 Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification filed by David Cox, Alet a Lilly. Case Management Statement due by 10/1/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 18, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
December 19, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 60 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by David Cox, Aleta Lilly. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 19, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lilly et al v. Jamba Juice Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamba Juice Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inventure Foods, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cox
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Godino
Represented By: Danielle A Stoumbos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleta Lilly
Represented By: Danielle A Stoumbos
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Godino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]