V. et al v. Wagner et al

Plaintiff: David Oster, Willie Beatrice Sheppard, Service Employees International Union United Health Care Workers West, SEIU United Long-Term Care Workers, SEIU Local 521, SEIU California State Council, United Domestic Workers of America, AFSCME, Local 3930, AFL-CIO, California United Homecare Workers, V.L. and C.R.
Defendant: John Wagner, David Maxwell-Jolly, California Department of Health Care Services and California Department of Social Services
Case Number: 4:2009cv04668
Filed: October 1, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29:0794 Job Discrimination (Handicap)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 94 RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE. Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/7/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 19, 2009 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Ex Parte Application to Proceed Under Fictitious Names. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/19/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 19, 2009 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Ex Parte Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Plaintiff C.R. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/19/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 19, 2009 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ex parte application and ex parte appointment of guardian ad litem cor V.L. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/19/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 23, 2009 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 16 MOTION Preliminary Injunction; denying without prejudice 20 Motion to Certify Class; denying 169 Motion for Reconsideration; (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 27, 2009 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 199 granting STIPULATION Re: Notices. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/27/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
November 18, 2009 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 219 GRANTING AS MODIFIED STIPULATION to Revise Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 11/18/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 25, 2009 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part 206 Plaintiffs' Motion for Civil Contempt Sanctions and Enforcing the Injunction (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 30, 2009 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER On Supplemental Notice to Counties Re: Provider Time-Cards For Hours Worked in November, 2009. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/30/09. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
December 30, 2009 279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 278 GRANTING AS MODIFIED STIPULATION {1} Granting Plaintiffs Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; {2} Setting Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint; and {3} Withdrawing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file the second amended complaint forthwith.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 12/30/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
April 7, 2010 298 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 297 Granting Stipulation Continuing Case Management Conference to May 4, 2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2010 02:00 PM.Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/07/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
May 4, 2010 303 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 300 Granting Stipulation to STAYING ALL DISTRICT COURT PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANTS' PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION APPEAL IN THE NINTH CIRCUIT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/4/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
September 9, 2010 308 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 307 Granting Stipulation CONTINUING THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANTS PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION APPEAL IN THE NINTH CIRCUIT. Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2010. Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/9/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
November 2, 2010 310 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 309 Granting Stipulation CONTINUING THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANTS PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION APPEAL IN THE NINTH CIRCUIT. Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2011. Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/2/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
February 3, 2011 313 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 312 Stipulation TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO APRIL 12, 2011. Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/3/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
April 6, 2011 315 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 314 Stipulation CONTINUING THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANTS' PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION APPEAL IN THE 9TH CIRCUIT. Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/6/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
December 1, 2011 417 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 323 Motion for Leave to File; granting 326 Motion to Shorten Time; granting 328 Motion for TRO (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 418 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 332 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION FOR OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDERnt (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 6, 2011 426 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, Docket No. 326.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/6/2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
December 6, 2011 427 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, Docket Number 323.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/6/2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
December 6, 2011 429 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF L.C.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF M.G. AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/6/2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
December 7, 2011 433 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' 419 EX PARTE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR 356 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. 356 MOTION to Certify Class set for 1/5/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 13, 2011 438 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' 435 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM SCHEDULING ORDER. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 356 MOTION to Certify Class Responses due by 12/15/2011. Replies due by 12/22/2011. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 12/23/2011. Replies due by 1/9/2012. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 1/19/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/13/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 23, 2011 443 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 440 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
March 2, 2012 505 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 356 Motion to Certify Class (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 2, 2012 506 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Docket No. 328). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on March 2, 2012. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 2, 2012 507 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on March 2, 2012. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
April 9, 2012 514 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS 273 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
May 4, 2012 515 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTION TO MARCH 2, 2012 505 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/4/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
July 19, 2012 518 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 516 Stipulation CONTINUING THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANTS PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION APPEALS IN THE NINTH CIRCUIT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
October 17, 2012 520 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 519 Stipulation CONTINUING THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PENDING RESOLUTION OF DEFENDANTS' PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION APPEALS IN THE NINTH CIRCUIT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
March 20, 2013 523 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE A STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/20/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 28, 2013 525 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 524 Stipulation and proposed order setting briefing and hearing schedule for preliminary approval of class action settlement. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
April 4, 2013 530 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 526 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement Agreement, and for an Order Directing Notice to the Class and Scheduling a Fairness Hearing. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
May 23, 2013 538 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 534 Final Approval of Class Settlement Agreement. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
August 7, 2013 542 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 541 Stipulation for Dismissal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2013)
September 3, 2014 545 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 544 Stipulation to Amend Settlement Agreement. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
October 6, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 14 Motion ; granting 19 Motion to Shorten Time; granting 86 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: V. et al v. Wagner et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oster
Represented By: Charles Hobson Wolfinger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Beatrice Sheppard
Represented By: Charles Hobson Wolfinger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Service Employees International Union United Health Care Workers West
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEIU United Long-Term Care Workers
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEIU Local 521
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEIU California State Council
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Domestic Workers of America, AFSCME, Local 3930, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California United Homecare Workers
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V.L.
Represented By: Charles Hobson Wolfinger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.R.
Represented By: Charles Hobson Wolfinger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wagner
Represented By: Michael A. Zwibelman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Maxwell-Jolly
Represented By: Susan M. Carson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Health Care Services
Represented By: Susan M. Carson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Social Services
Represented By: Susan M. Carson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]