Site Update Solutions LLC v. Accor North America Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Site Update Solutions LLC
Defendant: Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Aweber Systems Inc, CBS Corp, CDW LLC, Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Intuit Inc., Jasons Deli Corp, Linkedin Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.Com Inc, Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, The Walt Disney Company, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Time Warner, Inc.,, CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc. and Ticketmaster L.L.C.
Mediator: James W Knowles
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv03306
Filed: July 6, 2011
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2011 510 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Monster Worldwide, Inc. with Prejudice. Responses due by 8/2/2011. Replies due by 8/9/2011. (Goldstein, Edward) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 18, 2011 509 Joint Motion to Dismiss MySpace, Inc. with Prejudice filed by MySpace Inc. and Site Update Solutions LLC. Responses due by 8/1/2011. Replies due by 8/8/2011. (Chaikovsky, Yar) (Filed on 7/18/2011) Modified on 7/19/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2011 508 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 13, 2011 507 CLERKS NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer from the Eastern District of Texas, Case No. 10-cv-151. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 6, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 506 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/22/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/29/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 6, 2011 505 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:10-cv-00151. Case Electronically Transfered, copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 7/13/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2011 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California. (ch, )
June 8, 2011 504 Featured Case ORDER granting 502 Motion for Extension of Time to File Their Reply Claim Construction Brief 6/17/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/8/2011. (ch, )
June 8, 2011 503 Featured Case ORDER granting 373 Motion to Change Venue. Accordingly, the court GRANTS Dfts motion to transfer venue to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/8/2011. (ch, )
June 7, 2011 502 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File the Reply Claim Construction Brief by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
June 3, 2011 501 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INDEFINITENESS AS TO CLAIM 8 OF U.S. PATENT RE40,683 by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Corp, CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, David)
June 3, 2011 500 RESPONSE to 494 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Corp, CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc,>. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Stein, David)
June 3, 2011 499 REPLY to 494 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit /Declaration of V. de Gyarfas, # 2 Exhibit 1 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 3 Exhibit 2 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 4 Exhibit 3 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 5 Exhibit 4 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 6 Exhibit 5 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 7 Exhibit 6 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 8 Exhibit 7 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 9 Exhibit 8 to de Gyarfas Decl., # 10 Exhibit 9 to de Gyarfas Decl.)(DeGyarfas, Victor)
May 31, 2011 498 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores Inc of Service of Second Supplement to P.R. 3-3 Disclosures re Invalidity Contentions (DeGyarfas, Victor)
May 25, 2011 497 Featured Case ORDER granting 496 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William Bryan Farney; Bryan Donivan Atkinson and Steven Robert Daniels terminated as counsel of record for Monster Worldwide, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/25/11. (ehs, )
May 24, 2011 496 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Monster Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Atkinson, Bryan)
May 16, 2011 495 Featured Case ORDER granting 493 Motion for Leave to File. Walmart is granted leave to supplement its invalidity contentions and serve its Supplemental Invalidity Contentions on Plaintiff within two weeks of the entry of this Order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/16/11. (ehs, )
May 13, 2011 494 Plaintiff Site Update Solutions, Inc.'s Opening CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Re40,683 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B - Amendment under 37 CRF 1.111, # 3 Exhibit C - '198 Patent, # 4 Exhibit D - 2nd Suppl Amd to Correct Defects in Reissue)(Lipski, Alisa)
May 13, 2011 493 Second MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGyarfas, Victor)
May 12, 2011 492 Featured Case ORDER granting 491 Defendant Red Hat, Inc. Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims Against Site Update Solutions, LLC. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/12/11. (mrm, )
May 9, 2011 491 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims Against Site Update Solutions, LLC by Red Hat, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrews, John)
May 9, 2011 490 Featured Case ORDER, granting 488 MOTION to Dismiss Red Hat, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Red Hat, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/9/11. (mrm, )
May 6, 2011 489 Featured Case ORDER, granting 487 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/6/11. (mrm, )
May 6, 2011 488 MOTION to Dismiss Red Hat, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
May 4, 2011 487 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
May 3, 2011 486 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert L Masterson for Monster Worldwide Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-497) (ehs, )
May 3, 2011 485 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Justin F Boyce for Monster Worldwide Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-497) (ehs, )
April 19, 2011 484 Featured Case ORDER granting 483 Motion to Stay Deadlines. D eadlines for Starwood for 30 days, up to 5/18/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/19/2011. (ch, )
April 18, 2011 483 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
April 15, 2011 482 NOTICE by Site Update Solutions LLC Joint Claim Construction and Pre-Hearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Goldstein, Edward)
April 12, 2011 481 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael G Rhodes for Facebook Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-2774. (ch, )
April 12, 2011 480 Featured Case ORDER denying 476 Motion to Vacate Claim Construction Dates Pending Disposition of Transfer Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/12/11. (ehs, )
April 6, 2011 479 Featured Case ORDER granting 478 Motion to Stay Deadlines. Court GRANTS the Unopposed Motion and stays deadlines for Starwood for 14 days, up to and including 4/18/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 4/6/2011. (ch, )
April 4, 2011 478 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
April 1, 2011 477 NOTICE by CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, NBC Universal Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Staples Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc Request To Terminate Electronic Notification Of Filings (Doan, Jennifer)
March 30, 2011 476 Opposed MOTION to Vacate Claim Construction Dates Pending Disposition of Transfer Motion by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 30, 2011 475 NOTICE of Disclosure by Wal-Mart Stores Inc (DeGyarfas, Victor)
March 30, 2011 474 NOTICE of Disclosure by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc (Defendants' Notice of P.R. 4-2 Disclosure) (Andrews, John)
March 30, 2011 473 NOTICE of Disclosure by Site Update Solutions LLC Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Goldstein, Edward)
March 24, 2011 472 Featured Case ORDER granting 471 Motion to extend Patent Rule 4-2.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/24/11. (ehs, )
March 23, 2011 471 Joint MOTION To Extend Patent Rule 4-2 Deadline by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Corp, CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Site Update Solutions LLC, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrews, John)
March 22, 2011 470 Featured Case ORDER granting 469 Motion to Stay deadlines for Starwood for 14 days, up to and including April 4, 2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/22/11. (ehs, )
March 18, 2011 469 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines for Defendant Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
March 14, 2011 468 Featured Case ORDER - granting 467 Joint Motion to Postpone Claim Construction Related Deadlines. Claim Construction Hearing set for 8/3/2011 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/14/2011. (ch, )
March 7, 2011 467 Joint MOTION to Continue JOINT MOTION TO POSTPONE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION-RELATED DEADLINES by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Corp, CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Site Update Solutions LLC, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, David)
February 24, 2011 466 NOTICE by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc re 373 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 22, 2011 465 Featured Case ORDER granting 464 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra Elaine Gunter and Herbert A Yarbrough, III terminated as counsel for Newegg Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/22/2011. (ch, )
February 21, 2011 464 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Newegg Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
February 18, 2011 463 Featured Case ORDER granting 462 Motion to Withdraw. Defendants CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group Inc., Daily News L.P., Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc., Home Box Office Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Staples, Inc., Time Inc., and Ticketmaster L.L.C., withdraws Patricia Young as counsel of record for these defts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/18/11. (ehs, )
February 17, 2011 462 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Counsel of Record by CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Staples Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
February 11, 2011 461 NOTICE by Site Update Solutions LLC Notice of Compliance (Goldstein, Edward)
February 10, 2011 460 Featured Case ORDER granting 459 Motion to Stay Deadlines For Defendant Starwood. Deadlines for Starwood for 30 days, up to and including March 21, 2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/10/11. (ehs, )
February 9, 2011 459 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
February 4, 2011 458 NOTICE of Disclosure by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CBS Interactive Inc., CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc NOTICE OF SERVICE OF P.R. 4-1 EXCHANGE OF PROPOSED TERMS AND CLAIM ELEMENTS FOR CONSTRUCTION (Stein, David)
February 4, 2011 457 NOTICE of Disclosure by Site Update Solutions LLC of Service of Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction. (Goldstein, Edward)
February 4, 2011 456 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores Inc re Service of Supplemental P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (deGyarfas, Victor)
February 3, 2011 455 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew A Werber for HSN Inc.(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-263) (ehs, )
January 27, 2011 454 Featured Case ORDER granting 453 Motion for Leave to To Supplement Its Invalidity Contentions. Walmart is granted leave to supplement its invalidity contentions and serve its Supplemental Invalidity Contentions on Plaintiff within a week of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/27/11. (ehs, )
January 26, 2011 453 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to Supplement Its Invalidity Contention by Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(deGyarfas, Victor)
January 25, 2011 452 NOTICE of Disclosure by HSN Inc -- Notice of Disclosure of P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions and P.R. 3-4 Documentation -- (Thames, Earl)
January 20, 2011 451 Featured Case ORDER, granting 450 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Deli Management, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, and Deli Management, Inc. Deli Management, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/20/11. (mrm, )
January 19, 2011 450 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Deli Management, Inc. by Deli Management, Inc., Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
January 18, 2011 449 NOTICE of Disclosure by Choice Hotels International Inc Pursuant to PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Smith, Michael)
January 18, 2011 448 NOTICE of Disclosure by Wal-Mart Stores Inc Notice of Service of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (deGyarfas, Victor)
January 18, 2011 447 NOTICE of Disclosure by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Findlay, Eric)
January 18, 2011 446 NOTICE of Disclosure by CDW LLC (Notice of Service of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures) (Horton, Benjamin)
January 18, 2011 445 Featured Case ORDER granting 438 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeffrey G. Homrig terminated as counsel for Defendants CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group Inc., Daily News L.P., Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc., Home Box Office Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Staples, Inc., Time Inc., and Ticketmaster L.L.C.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/18/11. (ehs, )
January 17, 2011 444 NOTICE of Disclosure by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, MySpace Inc., Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation (Notice of Service of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures) (Stein, David)
January 15, 2011 443 NOTICE of Disclosure by CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Staples Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc (Notice of Service of P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures) (Doan, Jennifer)
January 14, 2011 442 NOTICE of Disclosure by Facebook Inc. Pursuant to PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Stameshkin, Elizabeth)
January 14, 2011 441 NOTICE of Disclosure by Overstock.com Inc Pursuant to PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Schenck, Christopher)
January 14, 2011 440 NOTICE by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Caracappa, John)
January 14, 2011 439 NOTICE of Disclosure by Monster Worldwide Inc Pursuant to PR 3-3 and 3-4 (Daniels, Steven)
January 14, 2011 438 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Counsel of Record) by CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Staples Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
January 13, 2011 437 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bret Bocchieri for HSN Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-221 (ch, )
January 11, 2011 436 Featured Case ORDER granting 434 Motion for Defendants to comply with P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4. Deadline extended to 1/14/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/11/11. (ehs, )
January 10, 2011 435 Featured Case ORDER granting 431 Motion Stay Deadlines for Defendant Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on January 10, 2011. (jml)
January 7, 2011 434 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Comply with P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Aweber Systems Inc, CBS Corp, CBS Interactive Inc., CDW LLC, CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Deli Management, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., Jasons Deli Corp, LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc, Target Corporation, The Walt Disney Company, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc, Time Warner, Inc.,, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
January 7, 2011 433 Featured Case ORDER, granting 430 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Nissan North America, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Nissan North America Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/7/11. (mrm, )
January 6, 2011 432 Featured Case ORDER, granting 427 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Thomson Reuters Holdings, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC; Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/6/11. (mrm, )
January 6, 2011 431 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
January 6, 2011 430 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Nissan North America, Inc. by Nissan North America Inc, Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
January 5, 2011 429 Featured Case ORDER, granting 428 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Wyndham Worldwide Corporation filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Wyndham Worldwide Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Inc terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/5/11. (mrm, )
January 4, 2011 428 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Wyndham Worldwide Corporation by Site Update Solutions LLC, Wyndham Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
January 3, 2011 427 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Thomson Reuters Holdings, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
January 3, 2011 426 NOTICE by Site Update Solutions LLC Notice of Firm Name Change for Edward W. Goldstein, Corby R. Vowell, Alisa A. Lipski and Wendy L. Boone (Goldstein, Edward)
December 27, 2010 425 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Serve Initial Disclosures by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
December 15, 2010 424 Featured Case ORDER granting 418 Motion for Joinder. Defendant Overstock.com, Inc. is joined in Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (Dkt. 373).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/15/10. (ehs, )
December 14, 2010 423 Featured Case ORDER granting 422 Motion for Extension of Time seeking an extension of time to serve its Initial Disclosures. Deadline extended to 12/27/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/14/10. (ehs, )
December 13, 2010 422 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Serve Initial Disclosures by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Erickson, Brian)
December 13, 2010 421 NOTICE of Disclosure by Monster Worldwide Inc of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Daniels, Steven)
December 9, 2010 420 NOTICE of Disclosure by Choice Hotels International Inc of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Smith, Michael)
December 8, 2010 419 REPLY to Response to Motion re 373 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc. (Stein, David)
December 8, 2010 418 Unopposed MOTION for Joinder in Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Overstock.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, John)
December 8, 2010 417 Featured Case ORDER granting 416 Motion for Joinder to Join in Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California, dkt # 373 . Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/7/10. (mrm, )
December 3, 2010 416 Unopposed MOTION for Joinder in Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (Dkt. 373) by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
December 3, 2010 415 Featured Case ORDER, granting 413 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Office Max, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Office Max Inc., Office Max Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/3/10. (mrm, )
December 2, 2010 414 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/2/10. (ehs, )
December 2, 2010 413 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Office Max, Inc. by Office Max Inc, Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
December 1, 2010 412 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher Schenck for Overstock.com Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-146(ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2010: # 1 Confidential Information) (ch, ).
December 1, 2010 411 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Protective Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
November 29, 2010 410 RESPONSE to Motion re 373 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Edward)
November 29, 2010 409 Plaintiff's Reply / ANSWER to 374 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of HSN, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
November 29, 2010 408 Featured Case ORDER granting 407 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit protective Order. The parties shall have until December 1, 2010 to submit an agreed Protective Order or the portions agreed and in dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/29/10. (ljw, )
November 24, 2010 407 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Protective Order by Wyndham Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, David)
November 24, 2010 406 Featured Case ORDER granting 403 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Response due by 11/29/2010. Reply due by 12/8/2010.Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on November 24, 2010. (jml)
November 24, 2010 405 Featured Case ORDER granting 402 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Deadline. OfficeMax, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures due December 10, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on November 24, 2010. (jml)
November 23, 2010 404 NOTICE of Disclosure by Site Update Solutions LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Amended Initial Disclosures (Goldstein, Edward)
November 22, 2010 403 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 373 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
November 22, 2010 402 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re Initial Disclosures by Office Max Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 18, 2010 401 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. (Heartfield, J)
November 18, 2010 400 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. (Montgomery, M.)
November 18, 2010 399 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. James W. Knowles, 909 ESE Loop 323, Suit 410, Tyler, Texas 75701, telephone number 903.534.3800 and fax number 903.534.3806, is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Mediation shall be completed by December 4, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/18/10. (ehs, )
November 17, 2010 398 NOTICE by Site Update Solutions LLC Parties Notice of Agreement To A Mediator (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter)(Goldstein, Edward)
November 17, 2010 397 Featured Case ORDER granting 396 Motion for extention of time to Submit Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/17/10. (ehs, )
November 16, 2010 396 Unopposed MOTION For Extension of Time of Submit Protective Order by Wyndham Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Lance)
November 15, 2010 395 Featured Case ORDER granting 390 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Defendant Adobe Systems Incorporated will have through November 19, 2010 to serve its Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/15/10. (ehs, )
November 15, 2010 394 Featured Case ORDER granting 383 Motion to serve its initial disclosures. Deadline extended to 11/26/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/15/10. (ehs, )
November 15, 2010 393 Featured Case ORDER granting 382 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Defendant Monster Worldwide, Inc. will have through December 13, 2010 to serve its Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/15/10. (ehs, )
November 13, 2010 392 NOTICE of Disclosure by Adobe Systems Incorporated Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Stein, David)
November 12, 2010 391 NOTICE of Disclosure by Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, MySpace Inc., Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Stein, David)
November 12, 2010 390 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery To Serve Initial Disclosures by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stein, David)
November 12, 2010 389 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores Inc of Service of Initial Disclosures (deGyarfas, Victor)
November 12, 2010 388 NOTICE of Disclosure by Site Update Solutions LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance with Initial Disclosures (Goldstein, Edward)
November 12, 2010 387 NOTICE of Disclosure by CDW LLC Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Horton, Benjamin)
November 12, 2010 386 NOTICE of Disclosure by Overstock.com Inc /Defendant Overstock.Com, Inc.'s Notice of Initial Disclosures (Barr, John)
November 12, 2010 385 NOTICE by CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Staples Inc, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc (Notice of Compliance With Local Rule 26(c)) (Andrews, John)
November 12, 2010 384 NOTICE of Disclosure by Facebook Inc. Regarding Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Stameshkin, Elizabeth)
November 12, 2010 383 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Deadline re Initial Disclosures by Office Max Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
November 12, 2010 382 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Rule 26(a)(1)) Initial Disclosures by Monster Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Daniels, Steven)
November 12, 2010 381 NOTICE of Disclosure by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric)
November 12, 2010 380 Featured Case ORDER, granting 377 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Accor North America, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Accor North America Inc. Accor North America Inc terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/12/10. (mrm, )
November 12, 2010 379 Featured Case ORDER granting 376 Motion for Extension of Time seeking an extension of time to serve its Initial Disclosures. Defendant Starwood Hotels &Resorts Worldwide, Inc. will have through December 13, 2010 to serve its Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/12/10. (ehs, )
November 12, 2010 378 Featured Case ORDER granting 375 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Choice Hotels International, Inc. has to service its Initial Disclosures to Plaintiff up to and including December 3, 2010.Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/12/10. (ehs, )
November 11, 2010 377 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Accor North America, Inc. by Accor North America Inc, Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
November 11, 2010 376 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Serve Initial Disclosures by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
November 11, 2010 375 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Choice Hotels International Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
November 5, 2010 374 First Amended ANSWER to 182 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by HSN Inc.(Lanser, Joseph)
November 3, 2010 373 MOTION to Change Venue (Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to The Northern District of California) by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Home Box Office, Inc., Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Target Corporation, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster L.L.C., Time Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13)(Doan, Jennifer)
October 29, 2010 372 Featured Case ORDER, granting 369 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Salesforce.com, Inc. filed by Site Update Solutions LLC, Salesforce.com Inc. Salesforce.com Inc terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/29/10. (mrm, )
October 28, 2010 371 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 321 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Red Hat, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 28, 2010 370 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 319 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 28, 2010 369 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Salesforce.com, Inc. by Salesforce.com Inc, Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
October 25, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Salesforce.com Inc to 11/5/2010. (ch, )
October 25, 2010 368 Featured Case ORDER granting 367 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Salesforce.com Inc deadline is extended to 11/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/25/2010. (ch, )
October 22, 2010 367 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond (Fourth) to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Salesforce.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose)
October 21, 2010 366 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. (jml)
October 21, 2010 365 NOTICE of Hearing:Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2012 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. (jml)
October 20, 2010 364 Featured Case DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/18/10, time to be set at a later date. Joinder of Parties due by 3/18/2011., Markman Hearing set for 7/13/2011 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/20/10. (ehs, )
October 20, 2010 363 Featured Case ORDER - The Court adopts the parties discovery provisions as outlined in the Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Conference (Dkt. No. 357).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/20/10. (ehs, )
October 18, 2010 362 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2010. (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney sign-in sheet) (jml)
October 18, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Salesforce.com Inc to 10/22/2010. (ehs, )
October 18, 2010 361 Featured Case ORDER granting 358 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant salesforce.com, inc. will have throughOctober 22, 2010 to answer,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/18/10. (ehs, )
October 15, 2010 360 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company (Craft, Roger)
October 15, 2010 359 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aden Martin Allen on behalf of Salesforce.com Inc (Allen, Aden)
October 15, 2010 358 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Repond (Third) to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Salesforce.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose)
October 14, 2010 357 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Docket Control Order)(Goldstein, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2010: # 2 Exhibit A - REVISED REMOVED THE PROPOSED OFF DOCKET CONTROL ORDER) (ch, ).
October 14, 2010 356 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Gabriel Fountain on behalf of Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc (Fountain, Aaron)
October 14, 2010 355 Featured Case ORDER granting 351 Motion to Dismiss Dft MSNBC Interactive News. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/14/2010. (sm, )
October 14, 2010 354 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Dwain Mazingo on behalf of HSN Inc (Mazingo, Jason)
October 14, 2010 353 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl Glenn Thames, Jr on behalf of HSN Inc (Thames, Earl)
October 13, 2010 352 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wendy Lynn Boone on behalf of Site Update Solutions LLC (Boone, Wendy)
October 13, 2010 351 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss MSNBC Interactive News, LLC by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 350 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 302 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Wyndham Worldwide Corporation by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 349 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 242 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 348 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 262 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Time, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 347 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 261 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Ticketmaster L.L.C. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 346 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 260 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Thomson Reuters Holdings, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 345 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 300 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Target Corporation by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 344 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 259 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Staples, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 343 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 298 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Sears, Roebuck and Co. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 342 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 243 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Overstock.com, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 341 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 267 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Nissan North America, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 340 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 278 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Deli Management, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 339 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 296 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Newegg, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 338 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 258 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim NBC Universal, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 337 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 294 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Myspace, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 336 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 292 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Linkedin Corporation by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 335 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 290 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Intuit, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 334 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 255 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Home Box Office, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 333 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 253 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 332 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 254 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Facebook, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 331 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 241 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 330 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 251 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Electronic Arts, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 329 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint 209 Amended Complaint,,, First Amended Answer by Monster Worldwide Inc. (Daniels, Steven)
October 12, 2010 328 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 250 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Daily News L.P. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 327 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 249 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim CNN Interactive Group, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 326 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 248 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim CBS Interactive Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 325 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 288 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Amazon.com, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 12, 2010 324 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 286 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Adobe Systems Incorporated by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
October 8, 2010 323 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE -- Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2010 02:40 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on October 7, 2010. (jml)
October 7, 2010 322 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Red Hat, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
October 7, 2010 321 Defendant Red Hat, Inc.'s ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Red Hat, Inc..(Doan, Jennifer)
October 7, 2010 320 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Walt Disney Company, Corporate Parent ABC Holding Company Inc. for American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.. (Caracappa, John)
October 7, 2010 319 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by American Broadcasting Companies, Inc..(Caracappa, John)
October 5, 2010 318 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Scott Andrews on behalf of Red Hat, Inc. (Andrews, John)
October 5, 2010 317 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Red Hat, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
October 5, 2010 316 SUPPLEMENTAL CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CDW LLC identifying Corporate Parent CDW Corporation of Delaware for CDW LLC. (Horton, Benjamin) Modified on 10/5/2010 to add Supplemental to docket entry per attorney (ehs, ).
October 4, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Salesforce.com Inc to 10/15/2010. (ehs, )
October 4, 2010 315 Featured Case ORDER granting 314 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant salesforce.com, inc. will have through October 15, 2010 to answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/4/10. (ehs, )
October 1, 2010 314 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Salesforce.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose)
September 29, 2010 313 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey G. Homrig on behalf of CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (Homrig, Jeffrey)
September 29, 2010 312 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina Marie Von der Ahe on behalf of CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (Von der Ahe, Christina)
September 29, 2010 311 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patricia Young on behalf of CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (Young, Patricia)
September 29, 2010 310 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Reines on behalf of CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (Reines, Edward)
September 28, 2010 309 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 228 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim HSN, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
September 27, 2010 308 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Allen Yates on behalf of Overstock.com Inc (Yates, John)
September 27, 2010 307 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2010 02:40 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml)
September 24, 2010 306 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Choice Hotels International Inc identifying Corporate Parent None for Choice Hotels International Inc. (Smith, Michael)
September 22, 2010 305 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nissan North America Inc identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Co., Ltd. for Nissan North America Inc. (Patterson, Jeffrey)
September 22, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
September 22, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Salesforce.com Inc to 10/1/2010. (ehs, )
September 22, 2010 304 Featured Case ORDER granting 265 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant salesforce.com, inc.s Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant salesforce.com, inc. will have through October 1, 2010 to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/22/10. (ehs, )
September 21, 2010 303 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wyndham Worldwide Inc identifying Other Affiliate Vanguard Windsor Funds for Wyndham Worldwide Inc. (Stein, David)
September 21, 2010 302 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Wyndham Worldwide Inc.(Stein, David)
September 21, 2010 301 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Target Corporation (Stein, David)
September 21, 2010 300 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Target Corporation.(Stein, David)
September 21, 2010 299 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sears Roebuck and Co identifying Corporate Parent Sears Holdings Corporation for Sears Roebuck and Co. (Stein, David)
September 21, 2010 298 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Sears Roebuck and Co.(Stein, David)
September 21, 2010 297 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Newegg Inc. (Stein, David)
September 21, 2010 296 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Newegg Inc..(Stein, David)
September 21, 2010 295 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MySpace Inc. identifying Corporate Parent News Corporation, Corporate Parent Fox Interactive Media for MySpace Inc.. (Stein, David)
September 21, 2010 294 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by MySpace Inc..(Stein, David)
September 21, 2010 293 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LinkedIn Corporation (Stein, David)
September 21, 2010 292 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by LinkedIn Corporation.(Stein, David)
September 21, 2010 291 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Intuit Inc. (Stein, David)
September 21, 2010 290 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Intuit Inc..(Stein, David)
September 21, 2010 289 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon.com Inc (Stein, David)
September 21, 2010 288 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Amazon.com Inc.(Stein, David)
September 21, 2010 287 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated (Stein, David)
September 21, 2010 286 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Adobe Systems Incorporated.(Stein, David)
September 21, 2010 285 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Time Inc identifying Corporate Parent Time Warner, Inc., for Time Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 284 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ticketmaster L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Media Corporation, Corporate Parent Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. for Ticketmaster L.L.C.. (Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 283 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc (Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 282 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Staples Inc (Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 281 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by NBC Universal Inc identifying Corporate Parent General Electric Company, Corporate Parent Vivendi Universal, S.A. for NBC Universal Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 280 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MSNBC Interactive News, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Electric Company, Corporate Parent NBC Universal, Inc., Corporate Parent Microsoft Corporation, Corporate Parent Microsoft I LLC, Corporate Parent NBC Desktop, Inc., Corporate Parent NBC/IJV, Inc., Corporate Parent Vivendi Universal, S.A,. for MSNBC Interactive News, LLC. (Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 279 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Deli Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Deli Management, Inc.. (Heartfield, J)
September 21, 2010 278 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Deli Management, Inc..(Heartfield, J)
September 21, 2010 277 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Home Box Office, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Time Warner, Inc., for Home Box Office, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 276 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CDW LLC identifying Corporate Parent VH Holdings, Inc. for CDW LLC. (Duston, Thomas)
September 21, 2010 275 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc identifying Corporate Parent Gannett Co., Inc., Corporate Parent JP Morgan Chase and Co. for Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 274 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, by Choice Hotels International Inc.(Smith, Michael)
September 21, 2010 273 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, by CDW LLC.(Duston, Thomas)
September 21, 2010 272 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Electronic Arts Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 271 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Daily News LP (Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 270 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CNN Interactive Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Time Warner, Inc.,, Corporate Parent Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Corporate Parent Cable News Network, Inc. for CNN Interactive Group, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 269 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc (Guaragna, John)
September 21, 2010 268 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc.(Guaragna, John)
September 21, 2010 267 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Nissan North America Inc.(Patterson, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2010 266 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CBS Interactive Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CBS Corporation for CBS Interactive Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 265 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Salesforce.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose)
September 21, 2010 264 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Accor North America Inc (Wynne, Richard)
September 21, 2010 263 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, by Accor North America Inc.(Wynne, Richard)
September 21, 2010 262 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Time Inc.(Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 261 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Ticketmaster L.L.C..(Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 260 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc.(Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 259 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Staples Inc.(Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 258 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by NBC Universal Inc.(Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 257 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Facebook Inc. (Keefe, Heidi)
September 21, 2010 256 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, and Affirmative Defenses by MSNBC Interactive News, LLC.(Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 255 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Home Box Office, Inc..(Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 254 Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Facebook Inc..(Keefe, Heidi)
September 21, 2010 253 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc.(Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 252 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, by Office Max Inc.(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 21, 2010 251 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Electronic Arts Inc..(Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 250 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Daily News LP.(Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 249 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by CNN Interactive Group, Inc..(Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 248 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by CBS Interactive Inc..(Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 247 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Monster Worldwide Inc (Daniels, Steven)
September 21, 2010 246 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, by Monster Worldwide Inc.(Daniels, Steven)
September 21, 2010 245 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Scott Andrews on behalf of CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (Andrews, John)
September 21, 2010 244 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C. (Doan, Jennifer)
September 21, 2010 243 Second Amended ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Overstock.com Inc.(Barr, John)
September 21, 2010 242 Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.'s ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, [Third], COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.(deGyarfas, Victor)
September 21, 2010 241 ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company.(Findlay, Eric)
September 20, 2010 240 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Time Inc served on 9/10/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent CT Corporation, answer due 10/1/2010. (ehs, )
September 20, 2010 239 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Ticketmaster L.L.C. served on 9/9/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent National Registered Agents Inc, answer due 9/30/2010. (ehs, )
September 20, 2010 238 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Home Box Office, Inc. served on 9/13/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent The Corporation Trust Co, answer due 10/4/2010. (ehs, )
September 20, 2010 237 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. CNN Interactive Group, Inc. served on 9/13/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent The Corporation Trust Co, answer due 10/4/2010. (ehs, )
September 20, 2010 236 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. CBS Interactive Inc. served on 9/10/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Lawyers Incorpo. Svc. Co. answer due 10/1/2010. (ehs, )
September 8, 2010 235 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 207 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
September 8, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. to 10/7/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 7, 2010 234 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 200 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Nissan North America, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
September 7, 2010 233 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to CBS Interactive Inc., (Attachments: # 1 CNN Interactive Group Inc, # 2 Home Box Office Inc, # 3 Ticketmaster LLC, # 4 Time Inc)(ch, )
September 7, 2010 232 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lance Lee (Lee, Lance)
September 7, 2010 231 Featured Case ORDER granting 208 Motion for Leave and GRANTS in part the motion to extend deadline. Within 14 days, the dfts shall answer the third amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/7/2010. (ch, )
September 7, 2010 230 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. ( Winston, R. Whitney )
September 7, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Red Hat, Inc. to 10/7/2010. 35 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 7, 2010 229 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HSN Inc identifying Corporate Parent HSN, Inc. for HSN Inc. (Lanser, Joseph)
September 7, 2010 228 HSN, Inc.'s ANSWER to 209 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by HSN Inc.(Lanser, Joseph)
September 3, 2010 227 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Red Hat, Inc..( Homrig, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Office Max Inc to 9/21/2010. (ehs, )
September 3, 2010 226 Featured Case ORDER granting 225 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended to 9/21/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 9/3/10. (ehs, )
September 2, 2010 225 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 209 Amended Complaint,,, by Office Max Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 1, 2010 224 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Overstock.com Inc (Barr, John)
August 30, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. to 9/7/2010. 8 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
August 30, 2010 223 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. ( Winston, R. Whitney )
August 25, 2010 222 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert Leo Burns, II for Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5586) (ehs, )
August 20, 2010 221 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 170 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, Facebook, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
August 20, 2010 220 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 179 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Overstock.com, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
August 20, 2010 219 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 175 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
August 20, 2010 218 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Red Hat, Inc. served on 8/12/2010 by CM RRR on Registered Agent CT Corporation System, answer due 9/2/2010. (ehs, )
August 20, 2010 217 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. served on 8/9/2010 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 8/30/2010. (ehs, )
August 20, 2010 216 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Umar Arshad for Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5578 (ch, )
August 20, 2010 215 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey C Totten for Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5578 (ch, )
August 19, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for CDW LLC to 9/7/2010. (ch, )
August 19, 2010 214 Featured Case ORDER granting 210 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft CDW LLC deadline is extended to 9/7/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/19/2010. (ch, )
August 19, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Accor North America Inc to 9/7/2010. (ch, )
August 19, 2010 213 Featured Case ORDER granting 206 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Accor North America Inc deadline is extended to 9/7/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/19/2010. (ch, )
August 19, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Overstock.com Inc to 9/7/2010. (ch, )
August 19, 2010 212 Featured Case ORDER granting 205 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Overstock,com Inc deadline is extended to 9/7/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/19/2010. (ch, )
August 19, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Salesforce.com Inc to 9/7/2010. (ch, )
August 19, 2010 211 Featured Case ORDER granting 204 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft saleforce.com Inc deadline is extended to 9/7/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/19/2010. (ch, )
August 18, 2010 210 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 182 Amended Complaint,,, by CDW LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger)
August 18, 2010 209 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint against Accor North America Inc, Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., CDW LLC, Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Deli Management, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Nissan North America Inc, Office Max Inc, Overstock.com Inc, Red Hat, Inc., Salesforce.com Inc, Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc, Target Corporation, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Time Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Wyndham Worldwide Inc, CBS Interactive Inc., CNN Interactive Group, Inc., Home Box Office, Inc., Ticketmaster L.L.C., filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- US RE40,683)(Goldstein, Edward)
August 18, 2010 208 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
August 18, 2010 207 Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company's ANSWER to 182 Amended Complaint,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company.(Findlay, Eric)
August 18, 2010 206 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 182 Amended Complaint,,, by Accor North America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
August 18, 2010 205 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 182 Amended Complaint,,, by Overstock.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yates, John)
August 18, 2010 204 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Second Amended Complaint (Unopposed) by Salesforce.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose)
August 18, 2010 203 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L Stameshkin on behalf of Facebook Inc. (Stameshkin, Elizabeth)
August 18, 2010 202 ANSWER to 182 Amended Complaint,,, (Second Amended Complaint) by Choice Hotels International Inc.(Smith, Michael)
August 18, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Office Max Inc to 8/31/2010. (ehs, )
August 18, 2010 201 Featured Case ORDER granting 199 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant OfficeMax to file its Answer is extended to August 31, 2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/18/10. (ehs, )
August 17, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
August 16, 2010 200 Nissan North America, Inc.s Original ANSWER to 182 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Nissan North America Inc.(Patterson, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2010 199 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 182 Amended Complaint,,, by Office Max Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2010 198 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K Erickson on behalf of Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc (Erickson, Brian)
August 10, 2010 197 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R Whitney Winston on behalf of American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. (Winston, R)
August 9, 2010 196 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Caracappa on behalf of American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. (Caracappa, John)
August 6, 2010 195 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 163 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
August 6, 2010 194 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark R Weinstein on behalf of Facebook Inc. (Weinstein, Mark)
August 6, 2010 193 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heidi Lyn Keefe on behalf of Facebook Inc. (Keefe, Heidi)
August 5, 2010 192 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patricia Young on behalf of CBS Corp, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, NBC Universal Inc, Staples Inc, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc (Young, Patricia)
August 5, 2010 191 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., (Attachments: # 1 Red Hat Inc)(ch, )
August 5, 2010 190 Featured Case ORDER granting 181 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/4/2010. (ch, )
August 4, 2010 189 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina Marie Von der Ahe on behalf of CBS Corp, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, NBC Universal Inc, Staples Inc, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc (Von der Ahe, Christina)
August 4, 2010 188 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Reines on behalf of CBS Corp, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, NBC Universal Inc, Staples Inc, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc (Reines, Edward)
August 3, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Salesforce.com Inc to 8/18/2010. (ehs, )
August 3, 2010 187 Featured Case ORDER granting 177 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant salesforce.com, inc. will have through August 18, 2010 to answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, )
August 3, 2010 186 Featured Case ORDER granting 174 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen J Joncus terminated for Time Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, )
August 3, 2010 185 Featured Case ORDER granting 173 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen J Joncus terminated for Turner Broadcasting System Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, )
August 3, 2010 184 Featured Case ORDER granting 172 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen J Joncus terminated for Target Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, )
August 3, 2010 183 Featured Case ORDER granting 171 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen J Joncus terminated for Amazon.com Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 8/3/10. (ehs, )
August 2, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Walt Disney Company to 8/18/2010. 19 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
July 30, 2010 182 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint against Accor North America Inc, Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, CBS Corp, CDW LLC, Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Deli Management, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Nissan North America Inc, Office Max Inc, Overstock.com Inc, Salesforce.com Inc, Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc, Target Corporation, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Wyndham Worldwide Inc, American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Red Hat, Inc., Time Warner, Inc.,, filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- US RE40,683)(Goldstein, Edward)
July 30, 2010 181 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and to Extend Defendants Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Edward)
July 30, 2010 180 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint re The Walt Disney Company. ( Winston, R. Whitney )
July 30, 2010 179 First Amended ANSWER to 107 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Overstock.com Inc.(Barr, John)
July 30, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 170, response. PLEASE IGNORE. See corrected document # 178 *** (ehs, )
July 30, 2010 178 ***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 170 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR***RESPONSE to 107 Amended Complaint,,, FACEBOOK'S ANSWER & COUNTERCLAIM by Facebook Inc.. (Dacus, Deron) Modified on 7/30/2010 (ehs, ).
July 30, 2010 177 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond (Unopposed) by Salesforce.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose)
July 30, 2010 176 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company (Findlay, Eric)
July 30, 2010 175 Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company's ANSWER to 107 Amended Complaint,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company.(Findlay, Eric)
July 30, 2010 174 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendant Time, Inc. by Time Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joncus, Stephen)
July 30, 2010 173 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendant Turner Broadcasting Systems, Inc. by Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joncus, Stephen)
July 30, 2010 172 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendant Target Corporation by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joncus, Stephen)
July 30, 2010 171 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Defendant Amazon.com Inc. by Amazon.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joncus, Stephen)
July 30, 2010 170 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 178 ***FACEBOOK, INC.'S ANSWER to 107 Amended Complaint,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Facebook Inc..(Dacus, Deron) Modified on 7/30/2010 (ehs, ).
July 26, 2010 169 Featured Case ORDER granting 168 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Neil J McNabnay terminated as counsel for deft Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/26/10. (ehs, )
July 23, 2010 168 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabnay, Neil)
July 23, 2010 167 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Ray Sorden on behalf of Nissan North America Inc (Sorden, Gary)
July 23, 2010 166 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Joseph Cox on behalf of Nissan North America Inc (Cox, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2010 165 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Scott Patterson on behalf of Nissan North America Inc (Patterson, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2010 164 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey G. Homrig on behalf of CBS Corp, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, NBC Universal Inc, Staples Inc, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc (Homrig, Jeffrey)
July 16, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
July 15, 2010 163 ANSWER to 107 Amended Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Wal-Mart Stores Inc.(deGyarfas, Victor)
July 15, 2010 162 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Victor deGyarfas on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Inc (deGyarfas, Victor)
July 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company to 7/30/2010. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Nissan North America Inc to 7/30/2010. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 15, 2010 161 Defendant, Enterprise Rent-A-Car Co's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Site Update Solutions LLC.( Goldstein, Edward)
July 15, 2010 160 Defendant Nissan North America, Inc's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Site Update Solutions LLC.( Goldstein, Edward)
July 15, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Accor North America Inc to 7/30/2010. (ch, )
July 15, 2010 159 Featured Case ORDER granting 152 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Accor North America Inc deadline is extended to 7/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/15/2010. (ch, )
July 15, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for CDW LLC to 7/30/2010. (ch, )
July 15, 2010 158 Featured Case ORDER granting 157 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. CDW LLC's deadline is extended to 7/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/15/2010. (ch, )
July 15, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Walt Disney Company to 7/30/2010. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
July 15, 2010 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
July 14, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 156, Application. PLEASE IGNORE. See document # 157 for corrected filing*** (ehs, )
July 14, 2010 157 ***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 155 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR ***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint by CDW LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Horton, Benjamin) Modified on 7/14/2010 (ehs, ).
July 14, 2010 156 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re The Walt Disney Company. ( Winston, R. Whitney )
July 14, 2010 155 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 157 ***>Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CDW LLC.( Horton, Benjamin) Modified on 7/14/2010 (ehs, ).
July 14, 2010 154 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vishal Hemant Patel on behalf of Accor North America Inc (Patel, Vishal)
July 14, 2010 153 ANSWER to 107 Amended Complaint,,, by Choice Hotels International Inc.(Smith, Michael)
July 14, 2010 152 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, by Accor North America Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wynne, Richard)
July 14, 2010 151 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Benjamin T Horton for CDW LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5481(ch, )
July 14, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Monster Worldwide Inc to 7/30/2010; Salesforce.com Inc to 7/30/2010; HSN Inc to 7/30/10 (ehs, )
July 14, 2010 150 Featured Case ORDER granting 146 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant salesforce.com, inc. will have through July 30, 2010 to answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/14/10. (ehs, )
July 14, 2010 149 Featured Case ORDER granting 145 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. deadline for Monster Worldwide, Inc. to answer is extended to July 30, 2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/14/10. (ehs, )
July 14, 2010 148 Featured Case ORDER granting 140 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for HSN Inc to answer reset for 7/30/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/14/10. (ehs, )
July 14, 2010 147 Featured Case ORDER granting 139 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John M Guaragna terminated as counsel for Adobe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/14/10. (ehs, )
July 13, 2010 146 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Salesforce.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Villarreal, Jose)
July 13, 2010 145 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint by Monster Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Atkinson, Bryan)
July 13, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Facebook Inc. to 7/30/2010; Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc to 7/30/2010. (ch, )
July 13, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Office Max Inc to 8/12/2010. (ch, )
July 13, 2010 144 Featured Case ORDER granting 134 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Facebook, Inc. to file an Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint is extended up to and including July 30, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/13/10. (ehs, )
July 13, 2010 143 Featured Case ORDER granting 135 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline for Defendant OfficeMax is 8/12/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/13/2010. (ch, )
July 13, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for CBS Corp to 8/5/2010; Daily News LP to 8/5/2010; Electronic Arts Inc. to 8/5/2010; Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc to 8/5/2010; MSNBC Interactive News, LLC to 8/5/2010; NBC Universal Inc to 8/5/2010; Staples Inc to 8/5/2010; Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc to 8/5/2010; Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc to 8/5/2010; Time Inc to 8/5/2010; Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc to 8/5/2010. (ch, )
July 13, 2010 142 Featured Case ORDER granting 133 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.s will have through July 30, 2010 to answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/13/10. (ehs, )
July 13, 2010 141 Featured Case ORDER granting 138 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. CBS, Daily News, EA, Gannet, MSNBC, NBC, Staples, Thomson, Time, Turner, and TicketMaster deadline is extended to 8/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/13/2010. (ch, )
July 13, 2010 140 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint by HSN Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lanser, Joseph)
July 13, 2010 139 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney John M. Guaragna by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
July 12, 2010 138 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, (Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) by CBS Corp, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, NBC Universal Inc, Staples Inc, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrews, John)
July 12, 2010 137 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Scott Andrews on behalf of CBS Corp, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, NBC Universal Inc, Staples Inc, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc (Andrews, John)
July 12, 2010 136 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of CBS Corp, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, NBC Universal Inc, Staples Inc, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc (Doan, Jennifer)
July 12, 2010 135 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, by Office Max Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 12, 2010 134 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
July 12, 2010 133 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, or Otherwise Respond by Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guaragna, John)
July 12, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Overstock.com Inc to 7/30/2010. (ch, )
July 12, 2010 132 Featured Case ORDER granting 129 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft OverStock.com Inc deadline is extended to 7/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/12/2010. (ch, )
July 12, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for LinkedIn Corporation to 7/30/2010. (ch, )
July 12, 2010 131 Featured Case ORDER granting 127 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft LinkedIn Corporation deadline is extended to 7/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/12/2010. (ch, )
July 12, 2010 130 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Facebook Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
July 12, 2010 129 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, by Overstock.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Yates, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2010: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
July 12, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. NOT IN PDF SEARCHABLE FORMAT AND NEED REVISED ORDER Document # 128, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
July 9, 2010 128 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, by Overstock.com Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Yates, John) Modified on 7/12/2010 (ch, ).
July 9, 2010 127 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, by LinkedIn Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
July 9, 2010 126 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of LinkedIn Corporation (Lee, Lance)
July 9, 2010 125 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M Stein on behalf of Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, MySpace Inc., Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation (Stein, David)
July 9, 2010 124 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yar R Chaikovsky on behalf of Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation, Wyndham Worldwide Inc (Chaikovsky, Yar)
July 9, 2010 123 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. MSNBC Interactive News, LLC served on 7/1/2010 by CM RRR on Registered Agent, Corporation Service Co, answer due 7/22/2010. (ehs, )
July 9, 2010 122 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Deli Management, Inc. served on 7/1/2010 by CM RRR c/o Registered Agent, CT Corporation System, answer due 7/30/2010. (ehs, )
July 9, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Adobe Systems Incorporated to 7/30/2010; Amazon.com Inc to 7/30/2010; Intuit Inc. to 7/30/2010; MySpace Inc. to 7/30/2010; Newegg Inc. to 7/30/2010; Sears Roebuck and Co to 7/30/2010; Target Corporation to 7/30/2010; Wyndham Worldwide Inc to 7/30/2010. (ehs, )
July 9, 2010 121 Featured Case ORDER granting 118 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Adobe Systems, Incorporated, Amazon.com, Inc., Intuit, Inc., MySpace, Inc., Newegg, Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co., Target Corporation and Wyndham Worldwide, Inc. time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to July 30, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/9/10. (ehs, )
July 9, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Deli Management, Inc. to 7/30/2010; Jasons Deli Corp to 7/30/2010. (ehs, )
July 9, 2010 120 Featured Case ORDER granting 119 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Jasons Deli Corp. and Deli Management, Inc.s time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to July 30, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/9/10. (ehs, )
July 8, 2010 119 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, by Deli Management, Inc., Jasons Deli Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
July 8, 2010 118 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 107 Amended Complaint,,, by Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., MySpace Inc., Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation, Wyndham Worldwide Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
July 8, 2010 117 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of Target Corporation (Lee, Lance)
July 8, 2010 116 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., MySpace Inc., Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Wyndham Worldwide Inc (Lee, Lance)
July 7, 2010 115 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., MySpace Inc., Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation, Wyndham Worldwide Inc (Montgomery, M.)
July 7, 2010 114 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Intuit Inc., MySpace Inc., Newegg Inc., Sears Roebuck and Co, Target Corporation, Wyndham Worldwide Inc (Heartfield, J)
July 7, 2010 113 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yar R Chaikovsky on behalf of MySpace Inc. (Chaikovsky, Yar)
June 30, 2010 112 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Deli Management, Inc. (Montgomery, M.)
June 30, 2010 111 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Deli Management, Inc. (Heartfield, J)
June 29, 2010 110 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M Stein on behalf of Deli Management, Inc. (Stein, David)
June 28, 2010 109 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 94 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Overstock.com, Inc. by Site Update Solutions LLC.(Goldstein, Edward)
June 28, 2010 108 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Deli Management, Inc., (Attachments: # 1 MSNBC Interactive News LLC)(ch, )
June 25, 2010 107 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Accor North America Inc, Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, CBS Corp, CDW LLC, Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Intuit Inc., LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Nissan North America Inc, Office Max Inc, Overstock.com Inc, Salesforce.com Inc, Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc, Target Corporation, The Walt Disney Company, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Wyndham Worldwide Inc, MSNBC Interactive News, LLC, Deli Management, Inc., filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- US RE40,683)(Goldstein, Edward)
June 22, 2010 106 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M Stein on behalf of Jasons Deli Corp (Stein, David)
June 15, 2010 105 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Aaron Shield on behalf of Overstock.com Inc (Shield, Christopher)
June 15, 2010 104 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Allen Yates on behalf of Overstock.com Inc (Yates, John)
June 14, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Aweber Systems Inc to 7/15/2010. 29 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 13, 2010 103 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Aweber Systems Inc.( Rogers, Charles)
June 10, 2010 102 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph R Lanser for HSN Inc.(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1- 5411)(ehs, )
June 10, 2010 101 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael R Levinson for HSN Inc.(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5411) (ehs, )
June 8, 2010 100 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Donivan Atkinson on behalf of Monster Worldwide Inc (Atkinson, Bryan)
June 8, 2010 99 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Robert Daniels on behalf of Monster Worldwide Inc (Daniels, Steven)
June 8, 2010 98 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Bryan Farney on behalf of Monster Worldwide Inc (Farney, William)
June 7, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CDW LLC to 7/15/2010. 38 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 7, 2010 95 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CDW LLC.(Findlay, Eric)
June 7, 2010 94 Original ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Site Update Solutions LLC by Overstock.com Inc.(Barr, John)
June 4, 2010 97 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc served CMRR on 5/17/2010. (ch, )
June 4, 2010 96 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Aweber Systems Inc served CMRR on 5/26/2010, answer due 6/16/2010. (ch, )
June 3, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Facebook Inc. to 7/15/2010. 42 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
June 3, 2010 93 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Facebook, Inc.( Goldstein, Edward)
June 2, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Walt Disney Company to 7/15/2010. 41 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 2, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for HSN Inc to 7/15/2010. (ch, )
June 2, 2010 92 Featured Case ORDER granting 88 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. HSN, Inc deadline is extended to 7/15/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/2/2010. (ch, )
June 2, 2010 91 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Walt Disney Company.( Goldstein, Edward)
June 2, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wyndham Worldwide Inc to 7/15/2010. 42 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 2, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company to 7/15/2010. 42 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 2, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Target Corporation to 7/15/2010. 42 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 1, 2010 90 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wyndham Worldwide Inc.( Stein, David)
June 1, 2010 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M Stein on behalf of Wyndham Worldwide Inc (Stein, David)
June 1, 2010 88 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, Move or Otherwise Respond by HSN Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blair, Misty)
June 1, 2010 87 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company.( Goldstein, Edward)
May 28, 2010 86 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Wyndham Worldwide Inc served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service Co, answer due 6/3/2010. (ehs, )
May 28, 2010 85 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o Lawyers Incorporaton Service Co, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, )
May 28, 2010 84 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Staples Inc served on 5/17/2010 by CM RRR c/o The Corporation Trust Co Corporation Trust Center, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, )
May 28, 2010 83 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Overstock.com Inc served on 5/17/2010 by CM RRR c/o Corporation Trust Center, answer due 6/7/2010. (ehs, )
May 28, 2010 82 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Office Max Inc served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o CSC Lawyers Incorporation Service Co, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, )
May 28, 2010 81 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Nissan North America Inc served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o Lexis Nexis Document Solutions Inc, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, )
May 28, 2010 80 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. NBC Universal Inc served on 5/17/2010 by c/o The Corporation Trust Company Corporation Trust Center, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, )
May 28, 2010 79 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. MySpace Inc. served on 5/17/2010 by CM RRR c/o The Corporation Trust Company Corporation Trust Center, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, )
May 28, 2010 78 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Monster Worldwide Inc served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o CSCS Lawyers Incorporating Service Co, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, )
May 28, 2010 77 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Intuit Inc. served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o Prentice-Hall Corporation System, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, )
May 28, 2010 76 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Facebook Inc. served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o CSC Lawyers Incorporation Service Co, answer due 6/3/2010. (ehs, )
May 28, 2010 75 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Choice Hotels International Inc served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o United States Corporation Co, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, )
May 28, 2010 74 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. CBS Corp served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o Lawyers Incorporating Svc Co, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, )
May 28, 2010 73 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Adobe Systems Incorporated served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c.o CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service Co, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, )
May 28, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Office Max Inc to 7/15/2010. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 28, 2010 72 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Office Max Inc.( DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 28, 2010 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Office Max Inc (Capshaw, Sidney)
May 28, 2010 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Office Max Inc (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 28, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wal-Mart Stores Inc to 7/15/2010. 42 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 27, 2010 69 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wal-Mart Stores Inc.( Smith, Michael)
May 27, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for NBC Universal Inc to 7/15/2010. 38 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 27, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Amazon.com Inc to 7/15/2010. 41 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 27, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Time Inc to 7/15/2010. 42 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 27, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc to 7/15/2010. 36 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 27, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Adobe Systems Incorporated to 7/15/2010. 42 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 26, 2010 68 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re NBC Universal, Inc.( Goldstein, Edward)
May 26, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Salesforce.com Inc to 7/15/2010. 42 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 26, 2010 67 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.com Inc. (Joncus, Stephen)
May 26, 2010 66 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Target Corporation. (Joncus, Stephen)
May 26, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Newegg Inc. to 7/15/2010. 41 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 26, 2010 65 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Time Inc.(Joncus, Stephen)
May 26, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for LinkedIn Corporation to 7/15/2010; Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc to 7/15/2010. 41 and 44 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 26, 2010 64 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc.( Joncus, Stephen)
May 26, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for MySpace Inc. to 7/15/2010; Staples Inc to 7/15/2010. 38 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 26, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc to 7/15/2010; Intuit Inc. to 7/15/2010; Nissan North America Inc to 7/15/2010; Sears Roebuck and Co to 7/15/2010. 42 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 26, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CBS Corp to 7/15/2010; Daily News LP to 7/15/2010; Electronic Arts Inc. to 7/15/2010. 42 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 26, 2010 63 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Adobe Systems Incorporated.( Guaragna, John)
May 26, 2010 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Guaragna on behalf of Adobe Systems Incorporated (Guaragna, John)
May 26, 2010 61 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Salesforce.com Inc.( Villarreal, Jose)
May 26, 2010 60 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Newegg Inc.(Yarbrough, Herbert)
May 26, 2010 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of Newegg Inc. (Gunter, Debra)
May 26, 2010 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert A Yarbrough, III on behalf of Newegg Inc. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
May 26, 2010 57 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Staples, Inc.( Goldstein, Edward)
May 26, 2010 56 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sears, Roebuck and Co.( Goldstein, Edward)
May 26, 2010 55 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nissan North America, Inc.( Goldstein, Edward)
May 26, 2010 54 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Myspace, Inc.( Goldstein, Edward)
May 26, 2010 53 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Linkedin Corporation.( Goldstein, Edward)
May 26, 2010 52 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Intuit, Inc.( Goldstein, Edward)
May 26, 2010 51 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Gannett Satellite Information Network, Inc.( Goldstein, Edward)
May 26, 2010 50 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc.( Guaragna, John)
May 26, 2010 49 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Electronic Arts, Inc.( Goldstein, Edward)
May 26, 2010 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Guaragna on behalf of Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc (Guaragna, John)
May 26, 2010 47 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Daily News L.P.( Goldstein, Edward)
May 26, 2010 46 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CBS Corp.( Goldstein, Edward)
May 26, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Monster Worldwide Inc to 7/15/2010. 42 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 25, 2010 45 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Monster Worldwide Inc.( Daniels, Steven)
May 25, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc to 7/15/2010. 42 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 25, 2010 44 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc.( Walker, R)
May 25, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Accor North America Inc to 7/15/2010. 44 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 25, 2010 43 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anthony S Gabrielson for CDW LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5377 (ch, )
May 25, 2010 42 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas L Duston for CDW LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5377(ch, )
May 25, 2010 41 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott A Sanderson for CDW LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5377(ch, )
May 25, 2010 40 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Accor North America Inc.( Wynne, Richard)
May 25, 2010 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr on behalf of Accor North America Inc (Wynne, Richard)
May 24, 2010 38 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin P Anderson for Choice Hotels International Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5373) (ehs, )
May 24, 2010 37 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory R Lyons for Choice Hotels International Inc. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5373) (ehs, )
May 24, 2010 36 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Aweber Systems Inc. (ch, )
May 21, 2010 35 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Wal-Mart Stores Inc served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o CT Corporation System, answer due 6/3/2010. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 34 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Time Inc served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o CT Corporation System, answer due 6/3/2010. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 33 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc served on 5/12/2010 by CM RRR c/o National Registered Agents Inc, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 32 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. The Walt Disney Company served on 5/14/2010 by CM RRR c/o Corporation Service Co, answer due 6/4/2010. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 31 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Target Corporation served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o CT Corporation, answer due 6/3/2010. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 30 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o CT Corporation System, answer due 6/3/2010. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 29 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Sears Roebuck and Co served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o CT Corp. System, answer due 6/3/2010. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 28 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Salesforce.com Inc served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o CT Corporation System, answer due 6/3/2010. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 27 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Newegg Inc. served on 5/14/2010 by CM RRR c/o Corporation Service Co, answer due 6/4/2010. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 26 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. LinkedIn Corporation served on 5/14/2010 by CM RRR c/o Corporation Service Co, answer due 6/4/2010. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Choice Hotels International Inc to 7/15/2010. 42 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 21, 2010 25 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Choice Hotels International Inc.( Smith, Michael)
May 21, 2010 24 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Jasons Deli Corp served on 5/12/2010 by CM RRR c/o Registered Agent Wiley D Jones, answer due 7/15/2010. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 23 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. HSN Inc served on 5/14/2010 by CM RRR c/o National Registered Agent, answer due 6/4/2010. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 22 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o CT Corporation System, answer due 6/3/2010. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 21 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o CT Corporation System, answer due 6/3/2010. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 20 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Electronic Arts Inc. served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o National Corporate Research Ltd, answer due 6/3/2010. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 19 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Daily News LP served on 5/14/2010 by CM RRR c/o The Prentice-Hall Corp System Inc, answer due 6/4/2010. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 18 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. CDW LLC served on 5/17/2010 by CM RRR c/o Illinois Corp Svc, answer due 6/7/2010. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Amazon.com Inc served on 5/14/2010 by CM RRR c/o Corporation Service Co, answer due 6/4/2010. (ehs, )
May 21, 2010 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Site Update Solutions LLC. Accor North America Inc served on 5/13/2010 by CM RRR c/o CT Corporation System, answer due 6/3/2010. (ehs, )
May 18, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc to 7/15/2010. 43 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 17, 2010 15 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc.( McNabnay, Neil)
May 17, 2010 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of CDW LLC (Craft, Roger)
May 17, 2010 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of CDW LLC (Findlay, Eric)
May 17, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Jasons Deli Corp to 7/15/2010. 43 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 17, 2010 12 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Jasons Deli Corp.( Heartfield, J)
May 17, 2010 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Jasons Deli Corp (Montgomery, M.)
May 17, 2010 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Jasons Deli Corp (Heartfield, J)
May 13, 2010 9 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge T. John Ward recused. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/13/2010. (ch, )
May 11, 2010 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Corby R Vowell on behalf of Site Update Solutions LLC (Vowell, Corby)
May 11, 2010 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alisa Anne Lipski on behalf of Site Update Solutions LLC (Lipski, Alisa)
May 11, 2010 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to NBC Universal Inc, (Attachments: # 1 Newegg Inc, # 2 Nissan North America Inc, # 3 Office Max Inc, # 4 Overstock.com Inc, # 5 Salesforce.com Inc, # 6 Sears Roebuck and Co, # 7 Staples Inc, # 8 Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc, # 9 Target Corporation, # 10 The Walt Disney Corporation, # 11 Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, # 12 Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, # 13 Time Inc, # 14 Turner Broadcasting System Inc, # 15 Wal-Mart Stores Inc, # 16 Wyndham Worldwide Inc)(ch, )
May 11, 2010 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Accor North America Inc, (Attachments: # 1 Adobe Systems Inc, # 2 Amazon.com Inc, # 3 Aweber Systems Inc, # 4 CBS Corp, # 5 CDW LLC, # 6 Choice Hotels International Inc, # 7 Daily News LP, # 8 Electronic Arts Inc, # 9 Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, # 10 Facebook Inc, # 11 Gannett Satelite Information Network Inc, # 12 HSN Inc, # 13 Intuit Inc, # 14 Jason Deli Corp, # 15 Linkedin Corporation, # 16 Monster Worldwide Inc, # 17 MySpace Inc)(ch, )
May 11, 2010 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Form AO 120)(Goldstein, Edward)
May 11, 2010 3 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to Site Update Solutions LLC (ch, )
May 11, 2010 2 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/11/2010. (ch, )
May 11, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Accor North America Inc, Adobe Systems Incorporated, Amazon.com Inc, Aweber Systems Inc, CBS Corp, CDW LLC, Choice Hotels International Inc, Daily News LP, Electronic Arts Inc., Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, Facebook Inc., Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc, HSN Inc, Intuit Inc., Jasons Deli Corp, LinkedIn Corporation, Monster Worldwide Inc, MySpace Inc., NBC Universal Inc, Newegg Inc., Nissan North America Inc, Office Max Inc, Overstock.com Inc, Salesforce.com Inc, Sears Roebuck and Co, Staples Inc, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide Inc, Target Corporation, The Walt Disney Company, Thomson Reuters Holdings Inc, Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc, Time Inc, Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Wyndham Worldwide Inc ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2477731.), filed by Site Update Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- US RE40,683, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldstein, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Site Update Solutions LLC v. Accor North America Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Site Update Solutions LLC
Represented By: Corby R Vowell
Represented By: Alisa Anne Lipski
Represented By: Edward W Goldstein
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Boone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: David Marc Stein
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Yar R. Chaikovsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: David Marc Stein
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Yar R. Chaikovsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aweber Systems Inc
Represented By: Charles J Rogers
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corp
Represented By: Christina Marie Von Der Ahe
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDW LLC
Represented By: Scott A Sanderson
Represented By: Benjamin T Horton
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Anthony S Gabrielson
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Thomas L. Duston
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Hotels International Inc
Represented By: Dirk van Ausdall
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Gregory R Lyons
Represented By: Edward Vincent King, Jr.
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Kevin Paul Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daily News LP
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc.
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company
Represented By: Umar Arshad
Represented By: Robert Leo Burns, II
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Scott Richard Mosko
Represented By: Jeffrey C Totten
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Heidi Lyn Keefe
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Elizabeth Lee Stameshkin
Represented By: Mark R. Weinstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gannett Satellite Information Network Inc
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSN Inc
Represented By: Bret Bocchieri
Represented By: Lawrence E. Butler
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Joseph Ronald Lanser
Represented By: Michael R Levinson
Represented By: Jason Dwain Mazingo
Represented By: E. Glenn Thames, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew Aaron Werber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuit Inc.
Represented By: Yar R. Chaikovsky
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: David Marc Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasons Deli Corp
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: David Marc Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linkedin Corporation
Represented By: Yar R. Chaikovsky
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: David Marc Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monster Worldwide Inc
Represented By: Justin F. Boyce
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Robert L. Masterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MySpace Inc.
Represented By: Yar R. Chaikovsky
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: David Marc Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBC Universal Inc
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newegg Inc.
Represented By: Yar R. Chaikovsky
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: David Marc Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overstock.Com Inc
Represented By: John Hanson Barr, Jr.
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Damien Patrick Lillis
Represented By: Martin Lukas Pitha
Represented By: Christopher Schenck
Represented By: Christopher Aaron Shield
Represented By: John Allen Yates
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Roebuck and Co
Represented By: Yar R. Chaikovsky
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: David Marc Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staples Inc
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Yar R. Chaikovsky
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Lance Lee
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: David Marc Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ticketmaster Entertainment Inc
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Represented By: Christina Marie Von Der Ahe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Inc
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Broadcasting Systems Inc
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Represented By: Christina Marie Von Der Ahe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Represented By: Victor DeGyarfas
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: Victor de Gyarfas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Walt Disney Company
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: R. Whitney Winston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Broadcasting Companies, Inc.
Represented By: John Caracappa
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: R. Whitney Winston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner, Inc.,
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Interactive Inc.
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNN Interactive Group, Inc.
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Box Office, Inc.
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ticketmaster L.L.C.
Represented By: John Scott Andrews
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: Edward Robert Reines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: James W Knowles
Represented By: James W Knowles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]