Ivy v. Davita

Plaintiff: Thysiah B. Ivy
Defendant: Davita
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv01326
Filed: March 25, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 22, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on July 22, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on August 16, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Dismissing 15 Third Amended Complaint Without Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on October 11, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
June 13, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on June 13, 2013. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ivy v. Davita
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thysiah B. Ivy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davita
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]