Actuate Corporation v. NCR Corporation et al

Defendant: M&T Bank Corporation and NCR Corporation
Plaintiff: Actuate Corporation
Case Number: 5:2013cv03494
Filed: July 29, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 39 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/24/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
July 9, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/9/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
August 14, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/14/1. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Actuate Corporation v. NCR Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T Bank Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCR Corporation
Represented By: Amanda Lynn Morgan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Actuate Corporation
Represented By: James Mitchell Lee
Represented By: Cyrus M Khojandpour
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]