Horton-v-United States of America

Defendant: United States Of America
Plaintiff: Bruce Horton
Case Number: 5:2013cv04912
Filed: October 23, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:183
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 11, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
January 21, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO APRIL 25, 2014. The Case Management Conference currently set for February 7, 2014 is continued to April 25, 2014. Lead counsel for plaintiff may, if he so wishes, file a request to appear at the conference by telephone. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 21, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
March 14, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 14, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton-v-United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Horton
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]