Leeds, LP v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Leeds, LP
Defendant: United States of America
 
Case Number: 3:2008cv00100
Filed: January 17, 2008
 
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
 
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7426 IRS: Wrongful Levy for Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2010 108 Featured Case ORDER Re Motions In Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony and Errata Sheet. The Court DENIES both of Defendant's motions [Docs. 88, 89]. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 10/5/10. (jer)
August 5, 2011 165 Featured Case Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Defendants Rule 50 motion on this issue is Denied. The Court finds in favor of the United States and against Plaintiffs Leeds Lp and Fourt Investment LP. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/5/11. (ecs)
June 1, 2010 81 Featured Case ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 57 Motion to Strike Witnesses and Exhibits. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 6/1/10. (vet) (jrl).
August 5, 2010 98 Featured Case ORDER RE CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT. The Court GRANTS the United States' 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court, however, holds that there is a genuine dispute of material fact regarding Plaintiff 9;s status as a subsequent purchaser. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's 59 Motion for Summary Judgment in its entirety. The Court DENIES as moot Plaintiff's 74 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 8/5/10. (jer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Leeds, LP v. United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leeds, LP
Represented By: William P Shannahan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]