Walsh v. Apple, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff David Walsh alleged that Defendant Apple Inc. consistently and uniformly denied its network engineers the required regular, overtime, and other compensation that federal and state laws require.

Plaintiff: David Walsh
Defendant: Apple, Inc. and DOES
Case Number: 3:2008cv01410
Filed: August 4, 2008
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: Labor: Fair Standards Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T. Miller
Referring Judge: Louisa S Porter
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2008 10
MOTION for More Definite Statement by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities MPA 1-16)(Perry, Jessica)
October 22, 2008 11
Joint MOTION for Change Venue and to Permit Plaintiff to file Second Amended Complaint by David Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Nordrehaug, Kyle) (tkl).
October 24, 2008 12
Case transferred to District of USDC, Northern District of CA, San Jose Division. Files transferred electronically to: *District of USDC, Northern District of CA, San Jose Division*.*280 South First Street**San Jose, CA 95113*. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 10/24/08. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/27/2008: # 1 Order) (tkl).
August 4, 2008 1
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Apple, Inc., DOES ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt #153621) filed by David Walsh.(jmz) (kaj).
August 4, 2008 2
Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc., DOES. (jmz)
August 26, 2008 3
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Apple, Inc.. (Perry, Jessica) (jpp). Modified on 8/27/2008 - Corrected motion event (jah).
August 27, 2008 4 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 3 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Time extended for Dft Apple, Inc. to answer to Complaint, Answer due 9/11/2008. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/27/2008. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(jah)
September 9, 2008 5
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all defendants, filed by David Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Blumenthal, Norman)
September 23, 2008 6
MOTION to Strike and for a More Definite Statement by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities MPA 1-16)(Perry, Jessica) Modified on 9/25/2008 (tkl). Emailed atty. This should be efiled as a 2 part motions. Atty to efile notice to withdraw document and re-efile motion; s/ on proof of service.
September 23, 2008 7
MOTION for Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities MPA 1-9, # 2 Declaration of Heather Ramirez (DEC 1-3))(Perry, Jessica). Modified on 9/25/2008 (tkl). Emailed atty re S/ on proof of service.
September 25, 2008 8
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 6 MOTION to Strike and for a More Definite Statement Corrected (Perry, Jessica)
September 25, 2008 9
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple, Inc. re 7 MOTION for Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION for Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) Corrected (Perry, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Walsh
Represented By: Norman B. Blumenthal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]