Sommer v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Cynthia Sommer
Defendant: United States of America, Rob Terwilliger, Rick Rendon, Mark Ridley, S.D. Adams, Jose Centeno, County of San Diego Medical Examiner's Office, Glenn N Wagner, County of San Diego District Attorney's Office, Bonnie Dumanis, Laura Gunn and Does 1 thorugh 100, inclusive
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv02093
Filed: September 24, 2009
 
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: Ruben B. Brooks
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2011 101 Featured Case ORDER Granting In Part Joint Motion For Extension of Time (Re Doc. 99 ): The Court grants the motion as follows: (1) written expert reports must be served no later than 9/30/2011; (2) reports intended solely to contradict or rebut evidence on the sa me subject matter identified by another party under Rule 26(a)(2)(B) must be served no later than 10/14/2011; (3) the parties will need to coordinate and schedule all expert witness depositions so that they are completed no later than 11/18/2011; (4) the deadline to file pretrial motions, other than motions in limine and motions to amend is 12/16/2011. No other dates or deadlines are affected by this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 9/8/2011. (mdc)
September 22, 2011 103 Featured Case ORDER (1) Granting In Part And Denying In Part Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Production Of Certain Documents; (2) Denying Plaintiff's Request For Sanctions (Re Doc. 83 ): Defendants are ordered to produce for the Court's in camera review the documents identified within 5 days of the filed date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 9/22/2011. (mdc)
October 3, 2011 104 Featured Case ORDER: (1) Requiring Production Of Plaintiff's Un-Redacted Fee Statements For In Camera Review; (2) Denying Defendant Dumanis's Motion To Compel Production Documents (Re Doc. 82 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/3/2011. (mdc)
December 21, 2011 118 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 107 Ex Parte Application to Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 12/21/11. (lao)
January 5, 2012 124 Featured Case ORDER: The Objection to Order Denying Defendant Dumanis' Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Doc. 106 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Defendant may file an additional motion to compel no later than twenty-five days from the date of this Order. All discovery matters are referred to Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal pursuant to Local Civil Rule 72.1(b). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 1/5/2012. (mdc)
February 3, 2012 141 Featured Case ORDER: The Objection to Order Denying Without Prejudice Ex Parte Application to Amend Scheduling Order (Doc. 120 ) filed by Plaintiff is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 2/3/2012. (mdc)
May 10, 2010 36 Featured Case ORDER re Motions to Dismiss. It is hereby Ordered that: The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Bonnie Dumanis and Laura Gunn 4 is Denied as to Plaintiff's § 1983 claim and Granted as to Plaintiff's claim for an injunction against future prosecution. The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Glenn N. Wagner 5 is Granted as to Plaintiff's § 1983 claim for Monell supervisory liability, Plaintiff's §§ 1985 and 1986 claims, and Plaintiff's claims fo r injunctive relief and is otherwise Denied. The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant the United States of America 15 is Granted as to the second claim for relief for violation of 42 U.S.C. §§ 1985 and 1986. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/10/10. (lao)
September 10, 2010 58 Featured Case ORDER: "Unnamed Putative Defendant" County of San Diego's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 32 ) is denied as moot because the County is not a defendant to this action. Rob Terwilliger's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 35 ) is granted. Jose Centa no's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 37 ) is granted as to Plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment claim and otherwise denied. Rick Rendon and Mark Ridley's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 38 ) is granted. S.D. Adams's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 41 ) is granted. Glenn N. Wagner's Motion to Dismiss as to claims brought against him in his federal capacity (Doc. 54 ) is granted. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 9/10/2010. (mdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sommer v. United States of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Sommer
Represented By: Stephen A Barber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Terwilliger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Rendon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ridley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.D. Adams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Centeno
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego Medical Examiner's Office
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn N Wagner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego District Attorney's Office
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Dumanis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Gunn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 thorugh 100, inclusive
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]