La Jolla Bank, FSB v. Tarkanian et al

Receiver: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: La Jolla Bank, FSB
Defendant: Danny Tarkanian, Amy M Tarkanian, Jerry Tarkanian, Lois Tarkanian, George Tarkanian, Zafrir Diamant, Josephine Diamant, Douglas R Johnson, Debra Johnson and DOES
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00980
Filed: May 6, 2010
 
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: William Q. Hayes
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2012 100 Featured Case ORDER: The Motion for Summary Judgment on the Counterclaims of Defendants Danny Tarkanian, Amy Tarkanian, Jerry Tarkanian, Lois Tarkanian, George Tarkanian, Zafir Diamant, and Josephine Diamant filed by Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation , as Receiver for La Jolla Bank, FSB, (Doc. 61 ) is granted. The counterclaims filed by Defendants Danny Tarkanian, Amy Tarkanian, Jerry Tarkanian, Lois Tarkanian, George Tarkanian, Zafir Diamant, and Josephine Diamant against Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation are dismissed. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/17/2012. (mdc)
May 3, 2012 103 Featured Case ORDER: The Motion for Summary Judgment on the Third Party Complaint filed by Third Party Defendant Ben Wiggins (Doc. 63 ) is granted as to the third party claims filed by Defendants Danny Tarkanian, Amy Tarkanian, Jerry Tarkanian, Lois Tarkanian, George Tarkanian, Zafir Diamant, and Josephine Diamant. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/3/2012. (mdc)
November 26, 2012 158 Featured Case ORDER: The Motion for Stay or Injunction Pending Appeal (Doc. 136 ) and the Motion to Set Aside Judgment (Doc. 137 ) filed by Defendants Danny Tarkanian, Amy Tarkanian, Jerry Tarkanian, Lois Tarkanian, George Tarkanian, Zafir Diamant, and Josephine Diamant are DENIED. The Motion for Oral Argument (Doc. 153 ) and Motion to Shorten Time (Doc. 154 ) filed by Defendants are denied as moot. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to issue the Writs of Execution as to Danny Tarkanian, Amy Tarkanian, Jerry Tarkanian, Lois Tarkanian, Zafir Diamant, and Josephine Diamant that were withheld on 6/25/2012. (Docs. # 120, 121, 125, 126, 127, 131). Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/26/2012. (mdc)
November 26, 2012 159 Featured Case ORDER: The Motion to Register Judgment in Foreign Districts filed by Plaintiff FDIC (Doc. 144 ) is GRANTED as to Defendants Danny Tarkanian, Amy Tarkanian, Jerry Tarkanian, Lois Tarkanian, Zafir Diamant, and Josephine Diamant. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to mail two certified copies of the 5/22/2012 Judgment in this case to Plaintiff FDIC. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 11/26/2012. (mdc)
October 5, 2010 22 Featured Case ORDER: The (Doc. 15 ) Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim under F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) and Motion to Strike under F.R.C.P. 12(f) is granted in part and denied in part. The motion to strike the request for punitive damages is granted. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 10/5/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; ECF registration requirement notice also mailed to Atty Louis A Galuppo.) (mdc)
April 17, 2012 97 Featured Case ORDER granting 52 Plaintiff's Motion to File Documents Under Seal: The sealed lodged proposed documents filed under ECF Nos. 53, 54, 60, and 62 shall be on the docket under seal. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 4/17/12. (lmt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: La Jolla Bank, FSB v. Tarkanian et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Oliva
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Jolla Bank, FSB
Represented By: Louis A Galuppo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Tarkanian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy M Tarkanian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Tarkanian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois Tarkanian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Tarkanian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zafrir Diamant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josephine Diamant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas R Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]