Kite Shipping LLC v. San Juan Navigation Corporation

Garnishee: Mandarin Fortune Shipping PTE. LTD.
Plaintiff: Kite Shipping LLC
Defendant: San Juan Navigation Corporation
Intervenor_plaintiff: Cardinal Shipping LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv02694
Filed: November 17, 2011
 
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Referring Judge: William V. Gallo
Presiding Judge: Barry Ted Moskowitz
 
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:1101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting the magistrates judge's 56 AMENDED ORDER Vacating Attachment without prejudice. The Court Stays the vacation of the attachment until 9/30/2012; Denying 33 International Materials Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Intervene. P laintiff may file a motion for reconsideration before this Court on or before 8/22/2012. Any opposition shall be filed on or before 8/29/2012. A reply may be filed by 9/5/2012. The Court will hear oral argument on any such motion for reconsideration on 9/12/2012 at 4:00 PM before Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 7/11/2012. (rlu)
September 13, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Adopting Magistrate Judge's 55 Order Vacating Attachment; and Denying 33 International Materials Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Intervene. The Court Stays the vacation of the attachment. Plaintiffs may engage in the discovery authorized by this Court's 59 Order filed 7/11/2012. Such discovery and consideration of the vacation of the stay shall be in accordance with Magistrate Judge Gallo's 67 Order filed 8/9/2012. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 9/13/2012.(rlu)
December 17, 2012 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 70 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal; Denying 73 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal; Denying 79 Joint Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Within 10 days of the filing of this Order, the Parties shall electronically file all of the documents that are not to be sealed, as well as the redacted versions of Exhibits A and B. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/17/2012. (rlu)
December 26, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 86 Motion for Reconsideration and Denying Plaintiffs' request for a stay pending appeal. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 12/26/2012. (rlu)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kite Shipping LLC v. San Juan Navigation Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Mandarin Fortune Shipping PTE. LTD.
Represented By: Andre M Picciurro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kite Shipping LLC
Represented By: Elene M Daley
Represented By: Conte C Cicala
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Juan Navigation Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Cardinal Shipping LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]