Shenzhen Fenda Technology Co. LTD v. Altec Lansing, LLC

Plaintiff: Shenzhen Fenda Technology Co. LTD
Defendant: Altec Lansing, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv02188
Filed: September 7, 2012
 
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: John A. Houston
Referring Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER Denying 45 Defendant Altec Lansing, LLC's Ex Parte Motion to Strike 42 Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/15/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
November 21, 2013 82 Featured Case ORDER Granting Defendant Prophet Equity, LP's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff Shenzhen Fenda Technologies' Fraud And Negligent Misrepresentation Claims Against Defendant Prophet Equity, LP (Re Doc. 52 ): Fenda is granted leave to amend only it s claims for fraud and negligent misrepresentation as asserted against Prophet Equity. Fenda's request to add claims for breach of fiduciary duty is denied. If Plaintiff wishes to file a third amended complaint, Plaintiff shall do so on or befor e 12/13/2013. The hearing on Prophet Equity's Motion to Dismiss, currently set for 11/22/2013, is vacated. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/21/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; ECF registration requirement notices also were mailed to Attys Thomas Yuhao Lai and Shiyong Ye.) (mdc)
January 14, 2014 94 Featured Case ORDER: (1) Denying 87 Plaintiff's Motion to File Documents Under Seal Without Prejudice; (2) Denying 88 , 90 , 92 Defendants' Motion to File Documents Under Seal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/14/2014. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Shenzhen Fenda Technology Co. LTD v. Altec Lansing, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shenzhen Fenda Technology Co. LTD
Represented By: Geoffrey T. Hill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altec Lansing, LLC
Represented By: Olga I. May
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]