Fontalvo et al v. Sikorasky Aircraft Corporation et al

Defendant: Does 1 through 100, Inclusive, Sikorsky Support Services, Inc., Sikorasky Aircraft Corporation, Dupont Aerospance Co., PKL Services Inc., G.E. Aviation Systems, LLC, E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company, Dupont De Nemours and Company LLC and United Technologies Corporation
Plaintiff: Dominic Fontalvo and Norma Fontalvo
Case Number: 3:2013cv00331
Filed: February 11, 2013
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Karen S. Crawford
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P. Curiel
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. The Court Vacates the hearing set for June 21, 2013. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/20/2013. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(srm)
August 15, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 13 Defendant GE Aviation's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff granted twenty days leave to file an amended complaint. The August 16, 2013 hearing is VACATED. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/15/2013. (srm)
June 20, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Denying 41 Defendant E.I Du Pont De Nemours and Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Sixth Cause of Action; (2) Granting in part and Denying in part 42 Defendant PKL Services Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First through Fourth and Sixth Cause of Action. Plaintiff is Granted thirty (30) days to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/20/2014. (srm)
October 9, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting 64 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; (2) Vacating Motion Hearing. The motion hearing set for October 24 at 1:30 p.m. is Vacated. The Clerk of Court Shall File Plaintiff's proposed Second Amended Complaint, (Dkt. No. 64 -3), as a separate docket entry. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/9/2014. (srm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fontalvo et al v. Sikorasky Aircraft Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sikorsky Support Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. Hickey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sikorasky Aircraft Corporation
Represented By: Christopher S. Hickey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont Aerospance Co.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PKL Services Inc.
Represented By: Bruce L Cleeland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.E. Aviation Systems, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Dupont De Nemours and Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont De Nemours and Company LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Christopher S. Hickey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Fontalvo
Represented By: Marshall James Shepardson
Represented By: Lars Christian Johnson
Represented By: Lawrence P. Grassini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Fontalvo
Represented By: Lars Christian Johnson
Represented By: Lawrence P. Grassini
Represented By: Marshall James Shepardson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]