Arellano v. Kellermeyer Building Service, LLC

Plaintiff: Agustin A. Arellano
Defendant: Kellermeyer Building Service, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00533
Filed: March 7, 2013
Court: California Southern District Court
Office: San Diego Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Janis L. Sammartino
Referring Judge: Bernard G. Skomal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) Granting 48 Ex Parte Motion for Order Continuing Hearing Date; (2) Denying as Moot Ex Parte Motion to Continue Hearing Date; and (3) Denying Ex Parte Motion to File Supplemental Brief (ECF. No. 41 ). The hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement (ECF No. 22) and Ms. Portillo's motion to intervene (ECF No. 20) is continued to September 15, 2014 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4B. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 7/25/2014. (knb)
December 5, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Motion for Order for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Court conditionally certifies the class for settlement purposes only. Court appoints named Plaintiffs, Agustin Arellano, Andres Lara, and Venancia Portillo, as Class Representatives. Court appoints Counsel for Portillo and Counsel for Arellano, as Class Counsel. Court approves the selection of CPT Group, Inc. to serve as the Settlement Administrator. Court approves the Notice of Class Action Settlement atta ched as Exhibit A to the Settlement. Court approves the Claim Form attached to the Settlement as Exhibit B. Court orders that the Parties effectuate the terms of the Settlement. Final Approval Hearing set for 4/13/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Cynthia Bashant. Named Plaintiffs' motion for final approval and supporting documents shall be filed pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures and Local Rules. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 12/5/2014. (jah)
April 22, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND ORDER granting 57 Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, Enhancement Awards, and Settlement; granting 59 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Court has jurisdiction over this matter pursuant to the Class Action Fairness A ct, 28 USC 1332(d). Court appoints Plaintiffs Venancia Portillo, Agustin Arellano, and Andres Lara as Class Representatives. Court appoints Counsel for Portillo and Counsel for Arellano as Class Counsel. Court grants final approval of the terms and conditions contained in the Agreement. Court approves CPT Group, Inc. to serve as the Settlement Administrator. Court approves the requested Enhancement Awards to be paid out of the Gross Settlement Value, in the amounts of $10,000 for Venancia Portillo, $2,500 for Agustin Arellano, and $5,000 for Andres Lara. Court approves attorney fees for Class Counsel in the amount of $675,000. Court approves reimbursement of costs incurred by Class Counsel in the amounts of $135,00 0 to Counsel for Portillo, and $10,984.14 to Counsel for Arellano. Court approves Settlement Administrator fees and costs in the amount of $55,000. Court enters final judgment in accordance with the terms and conditions of the Agreement, th e 12/4/2014 Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and this Order. Court shall retain exclusive and continuing jurisdiction over this action asnd the Parties for the purposes of supervising, administering, Implementing, enforcing, and interpreting the Agreement, and the claims process. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/22/2015. (jah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arellano v. Kellermeyer Building Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agustin A. Arellano
Represented By: Robert Craig Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellermeyer Building Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.